Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/12/2021 at 19:32:09 (UTC).

JACQUELINE FLORES VS CTI ENVIRONMENTAL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 JACQUELINE FLORES filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against CTI ENVIRONMENTAL, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2219

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORES JACQUELINE

Defendants

PARSONS CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION

CTI ENVIRONMENTAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PANITZ ERIC A.

Defendant Attorneys

MURPHY HARDY RAY

DOBSON MICHELE ANTOINETTE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/6/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER)

6/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER) OF 06/21/2021

6/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER) OF 06/21/2021

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

6/21/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Answer

6/1/2021: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/2/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

4/1/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Complaint

4/1/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • Hearing09/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • Docketat 10:20 AM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by CTI Environmental, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer) of 06/21/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Parsons Transportation Group, Inc. Erroneously Sued As Parsons Corporation, a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jacqueline Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jacqueline Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jacqueline Flores (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARSONS TRUSTEE, PETER S is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PANITZ ERIC A.