Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/09/2020 at 03:24:52 (UTC).

JACQUELINE DIAZ MIRAMONTES, ET AL. VS ADD DISTRIBUTION INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/27/2018 JACQUELINE DIAZ MIRAMONTES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ADD DISTRIBUTION INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOLLY E. KENDIG and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9723

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOLLY E. KENDIG

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIRAMONTES JACQUELINE DIAZ

Defendants

ADD DISTRIBUTION INC.

UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

TOLL GLOBAL FORWARDING

LAS VEGAS/LA EXPRESS INC.

ESTATE OF LEE EDDIE ACOSTA

ACOSTA LEE EDDIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALDER C MICHAEL

ALDER MICHAEL

Defendant Attorneys

ESTEN LAWRENCE D.

COVARRUBIAS MARIEL

FERRARIS J. PAT

SCHREIBER JOHN E.

MAYERS DARREN GREGORY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)]

10/20/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)]

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

7/13/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT

7/10/2020: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR EZEKIEL

6/25/2019: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR EZEKIEL

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/19/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/8/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

9/6/2019: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/2/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

10/2/2019: Answer

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

10/8/2019: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

10/8/2019: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE; HEARING ON MOT...)

10/30/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE; HEARING ON MOT...)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING APPLICATIONS FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF MATTHEW L. DIRISIO AND FRANK S. RESTAGNO

11/12/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING APPLICATIONS FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF MATTHEW L. DIRISIO AND FRANK S. RESTAGNO

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

4/27/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MSJ HEARING

6/9/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MSJ HEARING

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/27/2018: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/27/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department ; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Toll Global Forwarding (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of all unserved defendants)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Jacqueline Diaz Miramontes (Plaintiff); Nicolas Angulo (Plaintiff); Ezekiel Angulo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Toll Global Forwarding (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jacqueline Diaz Miramontes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jacqueline Diaz Miramontes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jacqueline Diaz Miramontes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jacqueline Diaz Miramontes (Plaintiff); Nicolas Angulo (Plaintiff); Ezekiel Angulo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Nicholas); Filed by Jacqueline Diaz Miramontes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Ezekiel); Filed by Jacqueline Diaz Miramontes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jacqueline Diaz Miramontes (Plaintiff); Nicolas Angulo (Plaintiff); Ezekiel Angulo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Jacqueline Diaz Miramontes (Plaintiff); Nicolas Angulo (Plaintiff); Ezekiel Angulo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jacqueline Diaz Miramontes (Plaintiff); Nicolas Angulo (Plaintiff); Ezekiel Angulo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STCV09723    Hearing Date: October 30, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

JACQUELINE DIAZ MIRAMONTES, ET AL.,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

ADD DISTRIBUTION, INC., ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: 18STCV09723

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT’S APPLICATIONS TO PERMIT FRANK S. RESTAGNO AND MATTHEW L. DIRISIO TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

October 30, 2019

Defendant seeks an order permitting Frank S. Restagno and Matthew L. DiRisio to appear as counsel pro hac vice in this action. The applications fully satisfy CRC 9.40. The applicants establish that they are licensed in the State of New York and other courts, and are in good standing. Each of the applicants has not appeared pro hac vice in any other case in the past two years. The applicants establish that they do not regularly work on live in California. A licensed California attorney, John E. Schreiber, is associated as counsel in this case.

Defendant provides proof of service of the applications on all parties who have appeared in the case, and also on the State Bar. The applications are unopposed and granted.

Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOLL GLOBAL FORWARDING USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Union Pacific Railroad Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALDER C MICHAEL