This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/15/2023 at 19:23:30 (UTC).

JACQUELINE CASARES ET AL VS WE ARE FAMILY TRANSPORTATION INC

Case Summary

On 01/30/2017 JACQUELINE CASARES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WE ARE FAMILY TRANSPORTATION INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DANIEL M. CROWLEY and STEPHEN M. MOLONEY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8808

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

STEPHEN M. MOLONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASARES JACQUELINE

Defendants

WE ARE FAMILY TRANSPORTATION INC

WE ARE FAMILY INC

Guardian Ad Litem

VALENZUELA EVELIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AZIZZADEH SHAWN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

3/1/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Judgment - JUDGMENT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT

7/6/2020: Judgment - JUDGMENT JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

11/7/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Order - Dismissal

12/13/2021: Order - Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)) OF 12/13/2021

12/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)) OF 12/13/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

12/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

9/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Notice of Settlement

6/15/2021: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)

6/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...) OF 06/15/2021

6/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...) OF 06/15/2021

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

3/11/2021: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

3/10/2021: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/22/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

2/4/2021: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)

1/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)

Unknown - CERTIFICATE OF FACTS RE: UNSATISFIED JUDGMENT DEFAULT (AMENDED 10-26-20)

10/28/2020: Unknown - CERTIFICATE OF FACTS RE: UNSATISFIED JUDGMENT DEFAULT (AMENDED 10-26-20)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENTS) OF 10/26/2020

10/26/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENTS) OF 10/26/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENTS)

10/26/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENTS)

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by JACQUELINE CASARES ET AL on 01/30/2017, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action, pursuant to CCP 581(b)(3)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 12/13/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 12/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 12/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 09/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 12/13/2021 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Jacqueline Casares (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No; Settlement Type: Unconditional; Set Hearing and Generate Notice?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 09/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
107 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketCalendaring:OSC RE Dismissal 10/29/18 at 8:30 am Dennis J. Landin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketProceeding/Event:Final Status Conference Dennis J. Landin 10:00 am

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-07-16 00:00:00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • DocketDocument:Order-Court Fee Waiver Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:Final Status Conference 07/16/18 at 10:00 am Robert B. Broadbelt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketDocument:Request-Waive Court Fees Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketDocument:Application-Miscellaneous Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Motor Vehicle - PI/PD/WD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****8808    Hearing Date: October 26, 2020    Dept: 28

Request for Default Judgment

Having considered all documents submitted in support of a default judgment, the Court rules as follows.

BACKGROUND

On January 30, 2017, Plaintiff Jaqueline Casares (“Plaintiff”) filed a complaint against Defendants We Are Family Transportation, Inc. and We Are Family, Inc. (collectively “Defendants”). The complaint alleges negligence for an automobile collision that occurred on March 26, 2015.

On September 3, 2019, the Court entered default against Defendant We Are Family Transportation, Inc.

On December 17, 2019, the Court entered default against Defendant We Are Family, Inc.

On January 6, 2020, the Court dismissed Does 1 through 10.

On April 24, 2020, the Court denied Plaintiff’s applications for default judgment against Defendants filed on December 17, 2019.

On July 6, 2020, Plaintiff filed applications for default judgment against Defendants.

Orders to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for a Failure to Enter Default as to Defendants are scheduled for January 11, 2021.

PARTY’S REQUEST

Plaintiff requests the Court to enter a default judgment against Defendants and award Plaintiff $1,011,922.28.

DISCUSSION

The Court finds default judgment may be entered against Defendant We Are Family Transportation, Inc. On August 2, 2018, Plaintiff filed a statement of damages and its proof of service on Defendant We Are Family Transportation, Inc. This statement of damages was served on Defendant We Are Family Transportation, Inc. on July 11, 2018, nearly two months before default was entered against Defendant We Are Family Transportation, Inc. This was a timely service of the statement of damages. (See Schwab v. Southern California Gas Co. (2004) 114 Cal.App.4th 1308, 1323.)

Moreover, Plaintiff’s requested special damages are properly awarded. Plaintiff has provided prima facie evidence of Plaintiff’s sustaining of $7,347.00 in special damages. The Court found on April 24, 2020 that Plaintiff did not evidence damages totaling Defendant We Are Family Transportation, Inc.’s accepted liability for $50,584.74 and damages in excess of that. However, Plaintiff’s attorney clarifies in a declaration here that Defendant We Are Family Transportation, Inc. did not accept liability for $50,584.74, but rather Plaintiff’s insurance paid that figure. Plaintiff is entitled to damages from Defendant We Are Family Transportation, Inc. regardless of whether Plaintiff’s insurance company paid for the expenses. (See Helfend v. Southern California Rapid Transit (1970) 2 Cal.3d 1, 3.)

Additionally, Plaintiff has provided a sufficient calculation for the requested prejudgment interest of $3,837.09 and a sufficient explanation of the requested $738.19 in costs.

However, Plaintiff has not shown an entitlement to $1,000,000.00 in general damages. The Court must view the evidence submitted in determining whether a particular amount of general damages would compensate for pain and suffering, emotional distress, and other non-quantifiable damages that flow from quantifiable damages. (See Licudine v. Cedars-Sinai Medical Center (2016) 3 Cal.App.5th 881, 892.) Plaintiff has submitted evidence of sustaining $7,347.00 in special damages from being dislodged from her seat in a moving vehicle driven by Defendants driver. Plaintiff was launched onto pavement. Images are lodged showing scaring and bruising. This is insufficient to show $1,000,000.00 would compensate Plaintiff. Rather, the Court finds that $100,000.000 is a sufficient amount of general damages considering Plaintiff’s injuries and special damages.

The Court finds the application filed against Defendant We Are Family, Inc. cannot be approved. The only evidence of a statement of damages with an attached proof of service is the statement of damages filed on August 2, 2018. This statement of damages was served on Defendant We Are Family Transportation, Inc., not Defendant We Are Family, Inc. Since there is no proof of service of a statement of damages served on Defendant We Are Family, Inc., the Court cannot grant default judgment against it.

CONCLUSION

The application for default judgment against Defendant We Are Family Transportation, Inc. is APPROVED for the amount of $111,922.28.

The application for default judgment against Defendant We Are Family, Inc. is DENIED.

Plaintiff is ordered to give notice of this ruling.