This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/01/2022 at 14:44:33 (UTC).

JACQUELINE BROWN, AN INDIVIDUAL VS FAMILY MINI MARKET, UNKNOWN ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/30/2021 JACQUELINE BROWN, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FAMILY MINI MARKET, UNKNOWN ENTITY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3737

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROWN AN INDIVIDUAL JACQUELINE

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

CHANG AN INDIVIDUAL SUSEY SOO HEE DBA FAMILY MINI MARKET

FAMILY MINI MARKET UNKNOWN ENTITY DBA FAMILY MINI MARKET

Cross Defendant

MOES 1 THROUGH 25 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SARGSYAN NINA

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

KENNEDY KEVIN P

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/30/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

12/29/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

3/28/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

Objection - OBJECTION SUPER A LIQUOR DBA FAMILY MINI MARKET AND SUSEY SOO HEE CHANG, INDIVIDUALLY, AND DBA FAMILY MINI MARKET’S JELD-WEN V. SUPERIOR COURT OBJECTION

3/22/2022: Objection - OBJECTION SUPER A LIQUOR DBA FAMILY MINI MARKET AND SUSEY SOO HEE CHANG, INDIVIDUALLY, AND DBA FAMILY MINI MARKET’S JELD-WEN V. SUPERIOR COURT OBJECTION

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/22/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Cross-Complaint

3/22/2022: Cross-Complaint

Answer

3/22/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES SUPER A LIQUOR DBA FAMILY MINI MARKET AND SUSEY SOO HEE CHANG, INDIVIDUALLY, AND DBA FAMILY MINI MARKETS DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTI

3/22/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES SUPER A LIQUOR DBA FAMILY MINI MARKET AND SUSEY SOO HEE CHANG, INDIVIDUALLY, AND DBA FAMILY MINI MARKETS DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTI

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2024
  • Hearing11/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • Hearing05/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • Hearing05/16/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Cross Complaint); Filed by SUPER A LIQUOR Erroneously Sued As FAMILY MINI MARKET, UNKNOWN ENTITY (Cross-Complainant); SUSEY SOO HEE CHANG, AN INDIVIDUAL (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SUPER A LIQUOR Erroneously Sued As FAMILY MINI MARKET, UNKNOWN ENTITY (Defendant); SUSEY SOO HEE CHANG, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketObjection (SUPER A LIQUOR DBA FAMILY MINI MARKET and SUSEY SOO HEE CHANG, INDIVIDUALLY, AND DBA FAMILY MINI MARKETS JELD-WEN V. SUPERIOR COURT OBJECTION); Filed by SUPER A LIQUOR Erroneously Sued As FAMILY MINI MARKET, UNKNOWN ENTITY (Defendant); SUSEY SOO HEE CHANG, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by SUPER A LIQUOR Erroneously Sued As FAMILY MINI MARKET, UNKNOWN ENTITY (Defendant); SUSEY SOO HEE CHANG, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees (SUPER A LIQUOR DBA FAMILY MINI MARKET and SUSEY SOO HEE CHANG, INDIVIDUALLY, AND DBA FAMILY MINI MARKET?S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF PAYMENT OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT); Filed by SUPER A LIQUOR Erroneously Sued As FAMILY MINI MARKET, UNKNOWN ENTITY (Defendant); SUSEY SOO HEE CHANG, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by SUPER A LIQUOR Erroneously Sued As FAMILY MINI MARKET, UNKNOWN ENTITY (Defendant); SUSEY SOO HEE CHANG, AN INDIVIDUAL (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JACQUELINE BROWN, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JACQUELINE BROWN, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JACQUELINE BROWN, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JACQUELINE BROWN, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KENNEDY KEVIN P.