This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/08/2021 at 14:43:11 (UTC).

JACQUELINE ALCANTARA-MEJIA VS EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, L.L.C., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 JACQUELINE ALCANTARA-MEJIA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT, L L C . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0627

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALCANTARA-MEJIA JACQUELINE

Defendants

EQUITY RESIDENTIAL MANAGEMENT L.L.C.

ERP OPERATING LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAPPNER ALEXANDER

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

9/7/2021: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/7/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/26/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2022
  • Hearing01/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof Of Service; Failure to Prosecute Case; Failure to File Request For Entry of Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • Hearing01/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jacqueline Alcantara-Mejia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jacqueline Alcantara-Mejia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jacqueline Alcantara-Mejia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Erp Operating Limited Partnership is a litigant

Latest cases where Equity Residential Management LLC is a litigant