This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/03/2020 at 05:33:34 (UTC).

JACOM CREDIT UNION VS HIGHLINE EXCHANGE INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/23/2019 JACOM CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HIGHLINE EXCHANGE INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5668

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JACOM CREDIT UNION AKA JAPANESE AMERICAN COMMUNITY CREDIT UNION

Defendants

HIGHLINE EXCHANGE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WALKER MYKEL LAWRENCE AKA MYKEL WALKER AKA MICHAEL LAWRENCE WALKER AKA MICHAEL L. WALKER AKA MICHAEL WALKER AKA MIKE LAWRENCE WALKER AKA MIKE L. WALKER AKA MIKE WALKER AKA MYKEL L. WALKER AKA MYKEL WALKER AKA MICHAEL LAWRENCE WALKER AKA MICHAEL

WANG QIAN

RUAN YALI AKA YALI RUAN AKA YA LIRUAN AKA YA RUAN AKA YALI RUAN AKA YA LIRUAN AKA YA RUAN

CHIU DARREN

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES

AUTOMAX MOTOR GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

UTOMO KENNETH

XU TONY AKA TONY HAO XU AKA TONY H. XU AKA HAO XU AKA HAU XU AKA ANTHONY XU AKA ANTHONY HOA XU AKA ANTHONY H. XU AKA JOHN XU AKA TONY HAO XU AKA TONY H. XU AKA HAO XU AKA HAU XU AKA ANTHONY XU AKA ANTHONY HOA XU AKA ANTHONY H. XU AKA JOHN

CHU DANIEL AKA ZHONG YU CHU AKA ZHONGYU CHU AKA ZHONG Y. CHU AKA ZHONG CHU AKA ZHONG YU CHU AKA ZHONGYU CHU AKA ZHONG Y. CHU AKA ZHONG CHU

PAK JOHN KYUNG YOON AKA JOHN PAK AKA KYUNG YOON PAK AKA KYUNG Y. PAK AKA KYUNG PAK AKA JOHN PAK AKA KYUNG YOON PAK AKA KYUNG Y. PAK AKA KYUNG PAK

STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIMON A. LYSA

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Dismissal

2/24/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/12/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/12/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/12/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration re: Due Diligence - PROOF OF SERVICE BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

11/12/2019: Declaration re: Due Diligence - PROOF OF SERVICE BY SUBSTITUTED SERVICE

Proof of Personal Service

11/12/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING WAIVER OF APPEARANCE BY AND OF MONETARY RECOVERY AGAINST DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES

11/7/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING WAIVER OF APPEARANCE BY AND OF MONETARY RECOVERY AGAINST DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/18/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration re: Due Diligence

10/18/2019: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/18/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/18/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Case Management Statement

10/18/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

11/5/2019: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

10/22/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION, ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE, AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING WAIVER OF APPEARANCE BY AND OF MONETARY RECOVERY AGAINST DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT

8/16/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION, ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE, AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING WAIVER OF APPEARANCE BY AND OF MONETARY RECOVERY AGAINST DEFENDANT CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/26/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/23/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by JACOM Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by JACOM Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by JACOM Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JACOM Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JACOM Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by JACOM Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by JACOM Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Docketamended complaint; Filed by JACOM Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by JACOM Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Stipulation, Acceptance of Service, and Proposed Order Regarding Waiver of Appearance By and Of Monetary Recovery Against Defendant California Department of Motor Vehicles); Filed by JACOM Credit Union (Plaintiff); California Department of Motor Vehicles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JACOM Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JACOM Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JACOM Credit Union (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JACOM CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases where AUTOMAX MOTOR GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIMON A. LYSA