This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2023 at 14:54:47 (UTC).

JACOBO DAVALOS VS CESAR FABRICIO SEDANO SANGUINETTI

Case Summary

On 11/16/2022 JACOBO DAVALOS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CESAR FABRICIO SEDANO SANGUINETTI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6305

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVALOS JACOBO

Defendant

SEDANO SANGUINETTI CESAR FABRICIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MCVARISH H. SCOTT

SHEGERIAN CARNEY R. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

TAVELMAN ALAN JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/16/2022: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

11/16/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

11/16/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/16/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/16/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

11/16/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/17/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/17/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

11/29/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/27/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT CESAR FABRICIO SEDANO SANGUINETTL'S VERIFIED ANSWER TO JACOBO DAVALOS' VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

12/27/2022: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT CESAR FABRICIO SEDANO SANGUINETTL'S VERIFIED ANSWER TO JACOBO DAVALOS' VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • Hearing02/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketAnswer DEFENDANT CESAR FABRICIO SEDANO SANGUINETTl'S VERIFIED ANSWER TO JACOBO DAVALOS' VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; Filed by: Cesar Fabricio Sedano Sanguinetti (Defendant); As to: Jacobo Davalos (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Cesar Fabricio Sedano Sanguinetti (Defendant); As to: Jacobo Davalos (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Jacobo Davalos (Plaintiff); As to: Cesar Fabricio Sedano Sanguinetti (Defendant); Service Date: 11/21/2022; Service Cost: 157.70; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Douglas W. Stern in Department 68 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketAddress for H. Scott McVarish (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 68

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jacobo Davalos (Plaintiff); As to: Cesar Fabricio Sedano Sanguinetti (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jacobo Davalos (Plaintiff); As to: Cesar Fabricio Sedano Sanguinetti (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jacobo Davalos (Plaintiff); As to: Cesar Fabricio Sedano Sanguinetti (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAVELMAN ALAN ESQ.