This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2021 at 17:20:51 (UTC).

JACOBA BURNHAM, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE HENDRICK O.B. VAN OTTERLOO TRUST DATED JUNE 8, 2009 VS STATE OF CALIFORNIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/13/2019 JACOBA BURNHAM, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE HENDRICK O B VAN OTTERLOO TRUST DATED JUNE 8, 2009 filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STATE OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4913

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BURNHAM INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE HENDRICK O.B. VAN OTTERLOO TRUST

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ARCADIS FIELD TECH SOLUTIONS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ECC CONSTRUCTORS LLC

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

ARCADIS CE INC. A NEW YORK CORPORATION

ARCADIS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

RCI GENERAL ENGINEERING INC.

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

ARCADIS U.S. INC.

MULTIPLE SERVICES PLUMBING INC. DBA CENTRAL SERVICES PLUMBING

ARCADIS U.S. INC

KD TRUCKING

HUBERT CONSTRUCTION INC.

Cross Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

ECC CONSTRUCTORS LLC

RCI GENERAL ENGINEERING INC.

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

ARCADIS U.S. INC.

MULTIPLE SERVICES PLUMBING INC. DBA CENTRAL SERVICES PLUMBING

MOES 1 THROUGH 25 INCLUSIVE

KD TRUCKING

MOES 1 THROUGH 25

ZOES 1 THROUGH 100

HUBERT CONSTRUCTION INC. MOE 2

HUBERT CONSTRUCTION INC.

K D TRUCKING

MULTIPLE SERVICES PLUMBING INC. MOE 3

MULTIPLE SERVICES PLUMBING INC.

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HACKER JEFFREY A.

HACKER JEFFREY ALAN

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

DAVIDSON DAVID

DENNIS EDDIE BANKUTI

KEUPER JANET LYNNE

LAKE KENNETH GREGORY

CHEN SONIA

WOOLFALL BRIAN DEREK

SIEGEL MARK

ALDERMAN DANIEL S.

EDIC WILLIAM S

ALDERMAN DANIEL SETH

SELVIN GARY ROBERT

CHENIER MAURICE L.

GLASPY MARY KATHLEEN

KNIGHT JUSTIN D

RAMIREZ DAVID

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

7/14/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY

Answer

7/28/2021: Answer

Answer

7/28/2021: Answer

Answer

8/2/2021: Answer

Answer

7/2/2021: Answer

Answer

6/3/2021: Answer

Answer

6/9/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

6/17/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (2ND)

6/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (2ND)

Answer

6/22/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/22/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

6/30/2021: Answer

Notice of Ruling

5/27/2021: Notice of Ruling

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/21/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/25/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/25/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Case Management Statement

4/30/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/5/2021: Case Management Statement

183 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • Hearing05/23/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 12 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • Hearing05/10/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 12 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Hubert Construction, Inc.. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Arcadis U.S., Inc. (Cross-Complainant); Karapet Dilbiyan (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by K D Trucking (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Change of Handling Attorney); Filed by RCI General Engineering Erroneously Sued As RCI General Engineering, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ECC Constructors, LLC (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by RCI General Engineering Erroneously Sued As RCI General Engineering, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Hubert Construction, Inc.. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Hubert Construction, Inc.. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
206 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jacoba Burnham, individually and as Trustee of the Hendrick O.B. Van Otterloo Trust Dated June 8, 2009 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jacoba Burnham, individually and as Trustee of the Hendrick O.B. Van Otterloo Trust Dated June 8, 2009 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jacoba Burnham, individually and as Trustee of the Hendrick O.B. Van Otterloo Trust Dated June 8, 2009 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Jacoba Burnham, individually and as Trustee of the Hendrick O.B. Van Otterloo Trust Dated June 8, 2009 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jacoba Burnham, individually and as Trustee of the Hendrick O.B. Van Otterloo Trust Dated June 8, 2009 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jacoba Burnham, individually and as Trustee of the Hendrick O.B. Van Otterloo Trust Dated June 8, 2009 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jacoba Burnham, individually and as Trustee of the Hendrick O.B. Van Otterloo Trust Dated June 8, 2009 (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KD TRUCKING is a litigant

Latest cases where HUBERT CONSTRUCTION INC. MOE 2 is a litigant

Latest cases where ARCADIS CE INC. A NEW YORK CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ECC CONSTRUCTORS LLC is a litigant