This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/15/2022 at 10:54:51 (UTC).

JACOB TAUBER VS ASSISTED LIVING AMERICA, V, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 JACOB TAUBER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ASSISTED LIVING AMERICA, V, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAWRENCE P. RIFF. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5825

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAWRENCE P. RIFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAUBER JACOB

Defendants

ASSISTED LIVING AMERICA V LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

1022 S. LA CIENEGA MANAGER LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEUTHE ERIC B

Defendant Attorneys

PETROVSKY LISA

ROWEN ERIC

 

Court Documents

Notice of Related Case

8/27/2021: Notice of Related Case

Answer

9/7/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 09/13/2021

9/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 09/13/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

9/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Case Management Statement

10/5/2021: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/07/2021

10/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/07/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

10/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Case Management Statement

10/8/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/14/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Related Case

10/19/2021: Notice of Related Case

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEARING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO QUASH, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

10/21/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEARING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO QUASH, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

Motion re: - MOTION RE: TO QUASH, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

10/21/2021: Motion re: - MOTION RE: TO QUASH, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH OR FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

10/21/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH OR FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ERIC BRYAN SEUTHE; EXHIBITS

10/22/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ERIC BRYAN SEUTHE; EXHIBITS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO ...)

10/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO ...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ERIC BRYAN SEUTHE RE FURTHER SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION

10/28/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ERIC BRYAN SEUTHE RE FURTHER SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

11/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/02/2021

11/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/02/2021

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 51, Lawrence P. Riff, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Consolidate - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 51, Lawrence P. Riff, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 51, Lawrence P. Riff, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Quash (Notice of Deposition or, Alternatively, for Protective Order) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department ; Court Order - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 51, Lawrence P. Riff, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 51, Lawrence P. Riff, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Consolidate - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 51, Lawrence P. Riff, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Motion for Judgment on...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Jacob Tauber (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Related Case)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ASSISTED LIVING AMERICA, V, LLC, a limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by 1022 S. La Cienega Manager, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Jacob Tauber (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jacob Tauber (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jacob Tauber (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jacob Tauber (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

b"

Case Number: *******5825 Hearing Date: November 2, 2021 Dept: 51

Background:

On July 14, 2021, Plaintiff Jacob Tauber (“Plaintiff” or “Tauber”) filed his Complaint against Defendant Assisted Living America, V, LLC (“Defendant” or “ALA V”), seeking repayment of a loan he allegedly gave to Defendant. The Complaint asserts causes of action for (1) breach of contract; (2) fraud and deceit; and (3) declaratory relief.

Defendant ALA V now moves to quash the notices of deposition for David Stapleton and David Kieffer.

Quash Deposition Subpoena

“If a subpoena requires the attendance of a witness or the production of books, documents, ;electronically stored information, ;or other things before a court, or at the trial of an issue therein, or at the taking of a deposition, the court, upon motion reasonably made by [a party], or upon the court's own motion after giving counsel notice and an opportunity to be heard, may make an order quashing the subpoena entirely, modifying it, or directing compliance with it upon those terms or conditions as the court shall declare, including protective orders. In addition, the court may make any other order as may be appropriate to protect the person from unreasonable or oppressive demands, including unreasonable violations of the right of privacy of the person.” (CCP ; 1987.1(a).)

Analysis

Defendant brings this motion on the grounds that Plaintiff has demanded untimely and premature depositions which, if taken now, would expose Defendant’s witnesses to unnecessary cumulative and duplicative discovery. Defendant asserts that Plaintiff’s deposition notice also seeks documents that are not relevant or reasonably calculated to lead to the discovery of admissible evidence and not specified with reasonable particularity. Defendant argues that the depositions are premature because this matter should be consolidated with related matters for discovery purposes, and all cases should be at issue before depositions go forward. Alternatively, Defendants requests that a protective order be issued barring Plaintiff from taking the depositions until the related matters have been consolidated and barring or limiting the documents requested.

The Court initially notes that Defendant has failed to provide a separate statement. Any motion involving the content of a discovery request or the responses to such a request must be accompanied by a separate statement. This includes motions to quash the production of documents or tangible things at a deposition. (CRC, Rule 3.1345.) Accordingly, the Court declines to analyze the content of the requests for production associated with the deposition notice.

The Court finds good cause to issue a protective order postponing the depositions until the Court rules on Defendant’s intended motion to consolidate. As Defendant states, multiple matters have been related to the instant case and Defendant intends to seek consolidation of all related matters for discovery purposes once they have all been deemed related in a single department. The taking of the depositions at this time may lead to duplicative discovery that may be obtained with less burden and expense if the matters are consolidated. (See CCP ; 2019.030(a)(1).) However, Defendant must relate all matters and file the motion to consolidate within a reasonable amount of time and no later than within 30 days of this Order.

The motion is GRANTED IN PART as discussed above.

Moving Party to give notice.

"