This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/05/2022 at 22:42:41 (UTC).

JACOB STREMFEL VS RANDY MATSUMOTO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/24/2021 JACOB STREMFEL filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RANDY MATSUMOTO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9592

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STREMFEL JACOB

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

RAMIREZ ELIZABETH

FELIX VICTOR

FELIX YIESEL

MATSUMOTO RANDY

TISCARENO RAUL

PEREZ DINORA

REYES JOSE

Cross Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Defendants

FELIX VICTOR

FELIX YIESEL

MATSUMOTO RANDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRANKLIN JOSHUA J.

Defendant Attorneys

CARRON PAUL ANDREW

MACKEY ROBERT T.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/24/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/24/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

6/10/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/15/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

8/10/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

8/10/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

8/10/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

10/21/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

10/21/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/21/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

10/21/2021: Answer

Notice of Change of Firm Name

1/27/2022: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Answer

12/6/2021: Answer

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2024
  • Hearing05/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • Hearing11/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • Hearing11/07/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Randy Matsumoto (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Randy Matsumoto (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Cross-Complaint); Filed by Yiesel Felix (Defendant); Victor Felix (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Yiesel Felix (Defendant); Victor Felix (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Yiesel Felix (Defendant); Victor Felix (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Yiesel Felix (Defendant); Victor Felix (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Randy Matsumoto (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Cross-Complaint); Filed by Randy Matsumoto (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Randy Matsumoto (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Randy Matsumoto (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Jacob Stremfel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jacob Stremfel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jacob Stremfel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jacob Stremfel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRANKLIN JOSHUA J.