This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/23/2023 at 11:04:04 (UTC).

JACOB REGAN, ET AL. VS URBAN FORESEIGHT V, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 JACOB REGAN, filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against URBAN FORESEIGHT V, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1161

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HERZOG DANIELLE

REGAN HERZOG LILY LYNN

REGAN JACOB

Defendants

DFT INC DBA THE CANNON MANAGEMENT COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

URBAN FORESEIGHT V LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GOMEZ MARK

FILIAN ARI JON

Defendant Attorney

DAY DOUGLAS L.

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

1/18/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/27/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Ruling

12/22/2022: Notice of Ruling

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

12/15/2022: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

12/15/2022: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; HEARING ON MOTIO...)

12/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL; HEARING ON MOTIO...)

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

12/15/2022: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Notice - NOTICE OF RE-SCHEDULED HEARING RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

12/1/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF RE-SCHEDULED HEARING RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARINGS ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS...)

11/3/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARINGS ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARINGS ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS...) OF 11/03/2022

11/3/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARINGS ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS...) OF 11/03/2022

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

10/11/2022: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

10/11/2022: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

10/11/2022: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

10/11/2022: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

10/11/2022: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

10/11/2022: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Answer

9/21/2022: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

9/21/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2024
  • Hearing06/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2023
  • Hearing12/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2023
  • Hearing12/13/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: JACOB REGAN (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: URBAN FORESEIGHT V, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); DFT INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: JACOB REGAN (Plaintiff); DANIELLE HERZOG (Plaintiff); LILY LYNN REGAN HERZOG (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel: Filed By: Stewart Edward Richlin (Attorney); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 12/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel: Filed By: Stewart Edward Richlin (Attorney); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 12/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel: Filed By: Stewart Edward Richlin (Attorney); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 12/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Signed and Filed by: Mark Gomez (Attorney); As to: DANIELLE HERZOG (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 06/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JACOB REGAN (Plaintiff); DANIELLE HERZOG (Plaintiff); LILY LYNN REGAN HERZOG (Plaintiff); As to: URBAN FORESEIGHT V, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); DFT INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JACOB REGAN (Plaintiff); DANIELLE HERZOG (Plaintiff); LILY LYNN REGAN HERZOG (Plaintiff); As to: URBAN FORESEIGHT V, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); DFT INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/13/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******1161 Hearing Date: December 15, 2022 Dept: 29

TENTATIVEPlaintiff’s counsel Mark Gomez’s motion to be relieved as counsel for Jacob Regan is GRANTED.

Plaintiff’s counsel Mark Gomez’s motion to be relieved as counsel for Danielle Herzog is GRANTED.

Plaintiff’s counsel Mark Gomez’s motion to be relieved as counsel for Lily Lynn Herzog is GRANTED.All orders effective upon filing proof of service of these orders with the court.