Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/11/2021 at 23:38:17 (UTC).

JACOB JOHNNY DOMINGUEZ, A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, RAUL DOMINGUEZ, ET AL. VS CITY OF BALDWIN PARK, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/09/2020 JACOB JOHNNY DOMINGUEZ, A MINOR, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM, RAUL DOMINGUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF BALDWIN PARK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7012

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROSALES FABVIOLA

DOMINGUEZ RAUL

ESCAMILLO OSCAR

MARTINEZ ANNA MARIE

ESCAMILLO MARIE

DOMINGUEZ LORENZO

QUINONEZ LINDA MARTINEZ

Defendants

GOMEZ SALVADOR

STATE OF CALIFORNIA

CITY OF WEST COVINA

CITY OF BALDWIN PARK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SUAREZ RODRIGO

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

1/11/2021: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

PI General Order

1/12/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

1/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

12/11/2020: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JACOB

12/11/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JACOB

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/9/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2023
  • Hearing12/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • Hearing06/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • Hearing05/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Jacob); Filed by Jacob Johnny Dominguez, a minor, by and through his guardian ad litem, Raul Dominguez (Plaintiff); Lorenzo Dominguez (Plaintiff); Fabviola Rosales (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jacob Johnny Dominguez, a minor, by and through his guardian ad litem, Raul Dominguez (Plaintiff); Raul Dominguez (Plaintiff); Lorenzo Dominguez (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jacob Johnny Dominguez, a minor, by and through his guardian ad litem, Raul Dominguez (Plaintiff); Raul Dominguez (Plaintiff); Lorenzo Dominguez (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF WEST COVINA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SUAREZ RODRIGO