This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/08/2020 at 08:43:22 (UTC).

JACKSON, SKAI SYED VS INITIALS ONLY, D.M.B

Case Summary

On 02/27/2020 JACKSON, SKAI SYED filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against INITIALS ONLY, D M B. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BOXER, DOREEN B., WAYSER, JOSHUA D. and DOTSON, KIMBERLY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1423

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BOXER, DOREEN B.

WAYSER, JOSHUA D.

DOTSON, KIMBERLY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JACKSON SKAI SYED

Respondents

BREGOLI DANIELLE MARIE

INITIALS ONLY D.M.B

 

Court Documents

Request - Dismissal

7/7/2020: Request - Dismissal

Request - Dismissal - Public - Redacted

6/30/2020: Request - Dismissal - Public - Redacted

Proof of Service - Mail - Public - Redacted

6/30/2020: Proof of Service - Mail - Public - Redacted

Minute Order

7/7/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Order Protecting Information of Minor CH170

6/17/2020: Notice - Order Protecting Information of Minor CH170

Order - Minor's Info Confidential CH165 (Public)

6/17/2020: Order - Minor's Info Confidential CH165 (Public)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 6, Dotson, Kimberly, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketRequest - Dismissal; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail ((Confidential) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketRequest - Dismissal ((Confidential) ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketRequest - Dismissal (Public - Redacted ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail (Public - Redacted ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketNotice - Order Protecting Information of Minor CH170; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Confidential Information CH175 (Confidential); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Barbara Bregoli in Support of Respondent's Request to Keep Minor Information Confidential (Confidential) )

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketNotice (of appearance of Andrew B. Brettler on behalf of plaintiff Skai S. Jackson ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (CH-116 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less