This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/21/2022 at 20:14:23 (UTC).

JACKSON, GALE - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 01/06/2022 JACKSON, GALE - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GARCIA, RUBEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0187

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GARCIA, RUBEN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WARD NORMA

Decedent

JACKSON GALE

Not Classified By Court

BUA JOSEPH SR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LEHN RICHARD ANTON

 

Court Documents

Supplement - to Petition

1/14/2022: Supplement - to Petition

Petition - Probate of Will (Initial)

1/6/2022: Petition - Probate of Will (Initial)

Will Deposited - 12 pgs - Dated - 05/03/2019

1/14/2022: Will Deposited - 12 pgs - Dated - 05/03/2019

Letters (Initial)

4/12/2022: Letters (Initial)

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

4/5/2022: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

Order - Probate

2/28/2022: Order - Probate

Will - Admitted

2/16/2022: Will - Admitted

Minute Order

2/16/2022: Minute Order

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

2/14/2022: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Supplement - to Petition

2/14/2022: Supplement - to Petition

Proof of Publication

2/14/2022: Proof of Publication

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2023
  • Hearing07/07/2023 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 9 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketLetters (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities (Confidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketOrder - Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 9, Garcia, Ruben, Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketWill (Admitted )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketSupplement (to Petition ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Publication; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Decedent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketWill Deposited (12 pgs - Dated - 05/03/2019 ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketSupplement (to Petition ); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketPetition - Probate of Will (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEHN RICHARD ANTON