This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/27/2021 at 09:42:46 (UTC).

JACKMAN, FRANK VS MELO, EMERSON YAKOV

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 JACKMAN, FRANK filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against MELO, EMERSON YAKOV. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are COHEN, LAURA and BRYAN, SHARON A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2197

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

COHEN, LAURA

BRYAN, SHARON A

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JACKMAN FRANK

Respondent

MELO EMERSON YAKOV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COHEN BARRY EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

9/14/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

9/14/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/20/2021: Minute Order

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

8/20/2021: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

8/20/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Proof of Service - Mail

7/23/2021: Proof of Service - Mail

Response - Elder/Dependent Abuse

7/23/2021: Response - Elder/Dependent Abuse

Minute Order

7/26/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

7/26/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

5/26/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

5/26/2021: Minute Order

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

5/26/2021: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Proof of Service

5/24/2021: Proof of Service

Notice - Limited Scope Representation

5/7/2021: Notice - Limited Scope Representation

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Partly Granted

5/7/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Partly Granted

Petition - Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse

5/7/2021: Petition - Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

5/7/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

5/7/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • Hearing10/07/2021 at 8:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Restraining Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 94, Cohen, Laura, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 94, Cohen, Laura, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 94, Cohen, Laura, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (Partly Granted ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketPetition - Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketNotice - Limited Scope Representation; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COHEN BARRY E.