This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/09/2023 at 10:14:21 (UTC).

JACKELINE MORALES VS XANITOS, INC., A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/22/2022 JACKELINE MORALES filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against XANITOS, INC , A CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MALCOLM MACKEY and MICHAEL P. LINFIELD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3614

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MALCOLM MACKEY

MICHAEL P. LINFIELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORALES JACKELINE

Defendants

XANITOS INC.

FIGUEROA LUIS FERNANDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DANESH SIMONA

Defendant Attorneys

ROMAIN GEORGE G.

MEQUET SHARON S.

 

Court Documents

Answer

7/24/2023: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PROTECTIVE -CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

7/11/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PROTECTIVE -CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING HEARIN...)

7/10/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING HEARIN...)

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF JACKELINE MORALES EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING HEARING DATES ON MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES

7/7/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF JACKELINE MORALES EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING HEARING DATES ON MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHARON S. MEQUET IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF JACKELINE MORALES EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING HEARING DATES ON MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHE

7/7/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SHARON S. MEQUET IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF JACKELINE MORALES EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING HEARING DATES ON MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHE

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

6/30/2023: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: CONTINUANCE OF EX PARTE)

6/26/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: CONTINUANCE OF EX PARTE)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

6/26/2023: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: CONTINUANCE OF EX PARTE) OF 06/26/2023

6/26/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: CONTINUANCE OF EX PARTE) OF 06/26/2023

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NEDA SAGHAFI, ESQ.

6/23/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF NEDA SAGHAFI, ESQ.

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING HEARING DATES ON MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES

6/23/2023: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION AND EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER ADVANCING HEARING DATES ON MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/14/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NEDA SAGHAFI, ESQ.

6/7/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NEDA SAGHAFI, ESQ.

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE, AND FOR AWARD OF MONETARY SANCTIONS AND ATTORNEYS FEES; DECLARATION OF NEDA SAG

6/7/2023: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS AMENDED DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE, AND FOR AWARD OF MONETARY SANCTIONS AND ATTORNEYS FEES; DECLARATION OF NEDA SAG

Separate Statement

6/6/2023: Separate Statement

Separate Statement

6/6/2023: Separate Statement

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

6/6/2023: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Separate Statement

6/6/2023: Separate Statement

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2024
  • Hearing03/11/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2024
  • Hearing03/01/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2023
  • Hearing10/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES OF PLAINTIFF?S AMENDED DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE, AND FOR AWARD OF MONETARY SANCTIONS AND ATTORNEY?S FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2023
  • Hearing10/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2023
  • Hearing10/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Luis Fernando Figueroa (Defendant); As to: Jackeline Morales (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • DocketStipulation and Order PROTECTIVE -CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY; Signed and Filed by: Jackeline Morales (Plaintiff); As to: Xanitos, Inc. (Defendant); Luis Fernando Figueroa (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses scheduled for 10/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses scheduled for 10/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES OF PLAINTIFFS AMENDED DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE, AND FOR AWARD OF MONETARY SANCTIONS AND ATTORNEYS FEES scheduled for 10/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 55

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketAddress for Simona Danesh (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Xanitos, Inc. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Xanitos, Inc., a corporation to Xanitos, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jackeline Morales (Plaintiff); As to: Xanitos, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Fernando Hernandez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael P. Linfield in Department 34 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jackeline Morales (Plaintiff); As to: Xanitos, Inc., a corporation (Defendant); Fernando Hernandez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jackeline Morales (Plaintiff); As to: Xanitos, Inc., a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less