This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2023 at 17:48:39 (UTC).

JACKELINE MAGANA RODRIGUEZ VS AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 JACKELINE MAGANA RODRIGUEZ filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO , INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0570

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAGANA RODRIGUEZ JACKELINE

Defendant

AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIRNOS ROGER

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/23/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/23/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/23/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Demand for Jury Trial

2/23/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/23/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/23/2023: Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

4/13/2023: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2023
  • Hearing07/07/2023 at 2:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: JACKELINE MAGANA RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 03/29/2023; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: JACKELINE MAGANA RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: JACKELINE MAGANA RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JACKELINE MAGANA RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JACKELINE MAGANA RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/07/2023 at 02:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Olivia Rosales in Department F Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less