This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2022 at 14:59:33 (UTC).

JACKELINE L. GOMEZ, ET AL. VS MITSUBISHI MOTORS NORTH AMERICA, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/24/2022 JACKELINE L GOMEZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MITSUBISHI MOTORS NORTH AMERICA, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0329

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DE SANTIAGO YSAIAS

GOMEZ JACKELINE L.

Defendant

MITSUBISHI MOTORS NORTH AMERICA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YASHAR NADIA

Defendant Attorney

RUGGERELLO RYAN

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

3/24/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

3/24/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/24/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/24/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/24/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/24/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

3/24/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/29/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

5/2/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

7/8/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/6/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/6/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

7/6/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2023
  • Hearing08/28/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2023
  • Hearing08/14/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Jackeline L. Gomez (Plaintiff); Ysaias De Santiago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by MITSUBISHI MOTORS NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by MITSUBISHI MOTORS NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by MITSUBISHI MOTORS NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jackeline L. Gomez (Plaintiff); Ysaias De Santiago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jackeline L. Gomez (Plaintiff); Ysaias De Santiago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jackeline L. Gomez (Plaintiff); Ysaias De Santiago (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUGGERELLO RYAN