This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/11/2021 at 20:59:11 (UTC).

JACK SIMANTOB, ET AL. VS MICHAEL S. DRUCKER, ESQ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 JACK SIMANTOB filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MICHAEL S DRUCKER, ESQ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9690

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

8451 MELROSE LLC A CALIFORNIA LLC

SIMANTOB JACK

8451 MELROSE PROPERTY LLC

Defendants

SINGER IAN J. ESQ

DRUCKER MICHAEL S. ESQ

FOLEY BEZEK BEHLE & CURTIS LLP

AKHTARZAD SINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MCGONIGLE TIMOTHY D

MCGONIGLE TIMOTHY DESIDERIO

Defendant Attorneys

ROSENSTEIN MICHAEL H

SWARTZ MICHAEL HOWARD

DRUCKER MICHAEL

DOLAN ROBERT TRACEY

 

Court Documents

Separate Statement

7/8/2021: Separate Statement

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

7/8/2021: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT SINA AKHTARZADS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON ANTI- SLAPP MOTION

6/15/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT SINA AKHTARZADS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON ANTI- SLAPP MOTION

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

6/15/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT FOLEY, BEZEK, BEHLE & CURTIS, LLPS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF ANTI-SLAPP MOTION

6/16/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT FOLEY, BEZEK, BEHLE & CURTIS, LLPS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF ANTI-SLAPP MOTION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING)

6/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION APPLICATION FOR (1) CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON ANTISLAPP MOTION TO PERMIT A MOTION TO COMPEL TO BE HEARD; AND (2), TO SHORTEN TIME ON A

6/22/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION APPLICATION FOR (1) CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON ANTISLAPP MOTION TO PERMIT A MOTION TO COMPEL TO BE HEARD; AND (2), TO SHORTEN TIME ON A

Opposition - OPPOSITION JOINT OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' RENEWAL EX PARTE APPLICATION

6/23/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION JOINT OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' RENEWAL EX PARTE APPLICATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION APPLICATION FOR (1) CONTINUAN...)

6/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION APPLICATION FOR (1) CONTINUAN...)

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF MINUTE ORDER

6/25/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF MINUTE ORDER

Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/25/2021: Answer - ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Answer

2/25/2021: Answer

Answer

2/25/2021: Answer

Answer

3/1/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

3/4/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/5/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

3/8/2021: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

Declaration - DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY D. MCGONIGLE IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

3/8/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY D. MCGONIGLE IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • Hearing07/11/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • Hearing07/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • Hearing09/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • Hearing09/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • Hearing08/31/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Production of Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (Lifting Stay on Discovery) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketMotion to Compel (Production of Documents); Filed by Jack Simantob (Plaintiff); 8451 Melrose Property, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ON MICHAEL S. DRUCKER, ESQ., AND INDIVIDUAL; AND FOLEY, BEZEK, BEHLE CURTIS LLP); Filed by Jack Simantob (Plaintiff); 8451 Melrose Property, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketStatus Report; Filed by Jack Simantob (Plaintiff); 8451 Melrose Property, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Jack Simantob (Plaintiff); 8451 Melrose LLC, a California LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jack Simantob (Plaintiff); 8451 Melrose LLC, a California LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Jack Simantob (Plaintiff); 8451 Melrose LLC, a California LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jack Simantob (Plaintiff); 8451 Melrose LLC, a California LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Jack Simantob (Plaintiff); 8451 Melrose LLC, a California LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: 20STCV39690 Hearing Date: August 31, 2021 Dept: 74

\r\n\r\n

20STCV39690 JACK\r\nSIMANTOB vs MICHAEL S. DRUCKER

\r\n\r\n

Plaintiffs’ Motion to Compel Discovery Responses from Defendant\r\nSina Akhtarzad and Further Responses from Defendant Foley, Bezek, Behle & Curtis

\r\n\r\n

TENTATIVE RULING: \r\nThis motion is actually two motions. \r\nPlaintiffs’ motion to compel further responses from defendant Foley,\r\nBezek, Behle & Curtis is DENIED as defendant’s responses conform to the\r\ncourt’s May 20, 2021 order. Plaintiffs’ motion\r\nto compel discovery responses from defendant Sina Akhtarzad is DENIED WITHOUT\r\nPREJUDICE to filing a separate motion.

\r\n\r\n'
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 8451 MELROSE LLC A CALIFORNIA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FOLEY BEZEK BEHLE & CURTIS LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCGONIGLE TIMOTHY D