This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/08/2019 at 17:09:09 (UTC).

JACK OHEBSIAN VS FOSTER ENTERPRISES ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/07/2017 JACK OHEBSIAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FOSTER ENTERPRISES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4226

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

OHEBSIAN JACK

Defendants and Respondents

GARCIA MARIO

FOSTER ENTERPRISES

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

YADIDI P. DAVID ESQ.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS, FOSTER ENTERPRISES AND MARIO GARCIA

4/11/2018: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS, FOSTER ENTERPRISES AND MARIO GARCIA

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

5/29/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

MEMO OF COSTS

5/29/2018: MEMO OF COSTS

DECLARATION OF JACK OHEBSIAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

5/29/2018: DECLARATION OF JACK OHEBSIAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

5/29/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

SUMMARY OF THE CASE

5/29/2018: SUMMARY OF THE CASE

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

5/29/2018: STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

JUDGMENT

5/29/2018: JUDGMENT

DECLARATION OF DAVID YADIDI IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT & AUTHENTICATION OF EXHIBITS 1-5

6/3/2018: DECLARATION OF DAVID YADIDI IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT & AUTHENTICATION OF EXHIBITS 1-5

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

11/16/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

10/10/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/10/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

6/7/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

Unknown

6/7/2017: Unknown

SUMMONS

6/7/2017: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/26/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/26/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

9/1/2017: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2018
  • DECLARATION OF DAVID YADIDI IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT & AUTHENTICATION OF EXHIBITS 1-5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Request; Filed by Jack Ohebsian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Memo of Costs; Filed by Jack Ohebsian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Jack Ohebsian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Jack Ohebsian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • MEMO OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by Jack Ohebsian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • SUMMARY OF THE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2017
  • Default Entered; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jack Ohebsian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Jack Ohebsian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Jack Ohebsian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC664226    Hearing Date: January 15, 2020    Dept: 24

Plaintiff Jack Ohebsian’s motion to amend judgment is taken off-calendar.

On June 7, 2017, Plaintiff Jack Ohebsian filed the instant motor vehicle personal injury suit against Defendants Foster Enterprises and Mario Garcia (“Garcia”). Defendants’ default was taken. Default Judgment was entered on May 29, 2018.

On December 19, 2019, Plaintiff moved to amend the judgment. No opposition was filed.

CCP section 116.630 states: The court may, at any time after judgment, for good cause, upon motion by a party and notice by the clerk to all affected parties at their last known address, amend the name of any party to include both the correct legal name and the actually used name or names of that party. This section applies to small claims courts. (See CCP § 116 et seq.) Thus, if the Court were to rule on this motion, it would be denied.

However, this case is not even before this department. When this suit was filed, it was assigned to Department 91, which later-became Department 2 of the Spring Street Courthouse (of the Personal Injury Hub). The record does not indicate it was transferred to Department 24.

Accordingly, the motion is taken OFF-CALENDAR.