Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2019 at 00:58:00 (UTC).

JACK NAZARIAN VS. AMTRUST INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS, LTD

Case Summary

On 04/06/2018 JACK NAZARIAN filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AMTRUST INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS, LTD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7087

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NAZARIAN JACK

NAZARIAN NOOSHIN

Defendants

AMTRUST INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS LTD

DOES 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TOMASSIAN SERGE .

Defendant Attorney

CLOSSON ROBERT VAIL

 

Court Documents

Notice

9/4/2018: Notice

Minute Order

9/7/2018: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department U; Unknown Event Type - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Jack Nazarian (Plaintiff); Nooshin Nazarian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department U; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Advanced-This date & continued) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • Miscellaneous; Filed by Amtrust International Underwriters, LTD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department U; Unknown Event Type - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Notice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Amtrust International Underwriters, LTD (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Jack Nazarian (Plaintiff); Nooshin Nazarian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Summons-Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMTRUST INTERNATIONAL UNDERWRITERS LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLOSSON, ROBERT V