This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2019 at 05:24:47 (UTC).

JACK GOULDEN VS TERRY HINRICHER ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/19/2017 JACK GOULDEN filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against TERRY HINRICHER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5624

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GOULDEN JACK

Defendants and Respondents

HINRICHER DOUGLAS & PORTER LLP

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

HINRICHER & CRASNICK LLP

HINRICHER & DOUGLAS LLP

HINRICHER TERRY

GOULDEN ELLIOTT M.

Other

VENTURA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT-UNLIMITED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SIMON DAWN T.

LAW OFFICES OF DAWN T. SIMON

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

TULLY STEPHEN J. ESQ.

GARRETT & TULLY P.C.

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

11/29/2017: ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS TERRY HINRICHER; HINRICHER & CRASNICK, LLP; HINRICHER & DOUGLAS, LLP; AND HINRICHER, DOUGLAS & PORTER, LLP'S MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION (CHANGE OF VENUE) AND FOR ATTORNEYS' FE

11/29/2017: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS TERRY HINRICHER; HINRICHER & CRASNICK, LLP; HINRICHER & DOUGLAS, LLP; AND HINRICHER, DOUGLAS & PORTER, LLP'S MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION (CHANGE OF VENUE) AND FOR ATTORNEYS' FE

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS TERRY HINRICHER; HINRICHER & CRASNICK, LLP; HINRICHER & DOUGLAS, LLP; HINRICHER, DOUGLAS & PORTER, LLP'S MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION (CHANGE OF VENUE) AND FOR ATTORNEYS' F

12/4/2017: NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS TERRY HINRICHER; HINRICHER & CRASNICK, LLP; HINRICHER & DOUGLAS, LLP; HINRICHER, DOUGLAS & PORTER, LLP'S MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION (CHANGE OF VENUE) AND FOR ATTORNEYS' F

Unknown

2/28/2018: Unknown

NOTICE OF OUTGOING TRANSFER

3/1/2018: NOTICE OF OUTGOING TRANSFER

HINRICHER DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO THE HINRICHER DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER (CHANGE OF VENUE)

11/20/2017: HINRICHER DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO THE HINRICHER DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER (CHANGE OF VENUE)

Unknown

11/20/2017: Unknown

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT TERRY HINRICHER'S MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE; DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY DAWN T. SIMON

11/14/2017: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT TERRY HINRICHER'S MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE; DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY DAWN T. SIMON

Unknown

10/11/2017: Unknown

VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. FINANCIAL ELDER ABUSE (CALIFORNIA WELFARE AND INSTITUTIONS CODE 15610, ETSEQ.); ETC

6/19/2017: VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. FINANCIAL ELDER ABUSE (CALIFORNIA WELFARE AND INSTITUTIONS CODE 15610, ETSEQ.); ETC

DECLARATION OF DAVID A. ESQUIBIAS, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS TERRY HINRECHER;ETC.

9/22/2017: DECLARATION OF DAVID A. ESQUIBIAS, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS TERRY HINRECHER;ETC.

DECLARATION OF TERRY HINRICHER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS TERRY HINRICHER; ETC.

9/22/2017: DECLARATION OF TERRY HINRICHER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS TERRY HINRICHER; ETC.

Unknown

9/22/2017: Unknown

DECLARATION OF JOSHUA R. ENGEL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS TERRY HINRICHER; ETC.

9/22/2017: DECLARATION OF JOSHUA R. ENGEL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS TERRY HINRICHER; ETC.

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2018
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • Notice of Outgoing Transfer; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • NOTICE OF OUTGOING TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • NOTICE OF OUTGOING TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • NOTICE OF OUTGOING TRANSFER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Terry Hinricher (Defendant); Hinricher & Crasnick, LLP (Defendant); Hinricher & Douglas, LLP (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANTS TERRY HINRICHER; HINRICHER & CRASNICK, LLP; HINRICHER & DOUGLAS, LLP; HINRICHER, DOUGLAS & PORTER, LLP'S MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTION (CHANGE OF VENUE) AND FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $4,550.00 PURSUANT TO CAL. CODE C

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Jack Goulden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. FINANCIAL ELDER ABUSE (CALIFORNIA WELFARE AND INSTITUTIONS CODE 15610, ETSEQ.); ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VENTURA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT/ is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIMON DAWN T.