This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/12/2019 at 17:24:41 (UTC).

JACK FAINSTADT VS NICOLE WEBB

Case Summary

On 11/16/2017 JACK FAINSTADT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NICOLE WEBB. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3836

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

FAINSTADT JACK

Respondents and Defendants

WEBB NICOLE

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

GOLDSZER RONALD I. ESQ.

SHEMARIA JOSEPH

Defendant Attorney

SCHNEIDER ERIC

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

11/16/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

11/16/2017: SUMMONS

Stipulation and Order

4/15/2019: Stipulation and Order

Answer

3/6/2019: Answer

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

1/30/2019: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Substitution of Attorney

12/20/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

12/19/2018: Substitution of Attorney

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Continue Trial); Filed by NICOLE WEBB (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by NICOLE WEBB (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Mailing (Substituted Service); Filed by JACK FAINSTADT (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by JACK FAINSTADT (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney (Civil (Without Court Order)); Filed by Joseph Shemaria (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JACK FAINSTADT (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****3836    Hearing Date: December 09, 2019    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

On November 16, 2017, plaintiff Jack Fainstadt filed this action against defendant Nicole Webb alleging negligence arising from a motor vehicle accident. On October 29, 2019, Plaintiff filed this motion requesting leave to file a First Amended Complaint with the box for punitive damages checked. On November 15, 2019, Plaintiff filed a stipulation where the parties agree Plaintiff may file a First Amended Complaint. Accordingly, Plaintiff’s Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff to file the First Amended Complaint within 5 days of the date of this order.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative. The Court will be dark on December 9, 2019. A party requesting argument should contact Dept. 4B for an alternate hearing date.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHNEIDER ERIC