This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/09/2021 at 21:58:13 (UTC).

JACK E WASSERSTEIN, DDS VS TOURNEY PROFESSIONAL PARTNERS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 JACK E WASSERSTEIN, DDS filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against TOURNEY PROFESSIONAL PARTNERS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0409

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WASSERSTEIN JACK DDS

Respondents

STEVEN ARIMA

DEAN LANG

TOURNEY PROFESSIONAL PARTNERS LLC

KELLY SMUDDE AND ALLEN SMUDDE

VIRGINIA HUGHSON-OTTE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

DECLERCQ WILLIAM

DECLERCQ WILLIAM B.

Respondent Attorney

MORGAN JUSTIN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/9/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/9/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Petition to Vacate or Alter Arbitration Award (CCP 1285 - 1287.6)

2/8/2021: Petition to Vacate or Alter Arbitration Award (CCP 1285 - 1287.6)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PETITIONER JACK E. WASSERSTEIN IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO VACATE INTERIM ARBITRATION AWARD

2/8/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PETITIONER JACK E. WASSERSTEIN IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO VACATE INTERIM ARBITRATION AWARD

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JUSTIN MORGAN, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF TOURNEY PROFESSIONAL PARTNERS, LLC'S REPONSE TOW ASSERSTEIN'S PETITION TO VACATE THE INTERIM ARBITRATION AWARD

2/22/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JUSTIN MORGAN, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF TOURNEY PROFESSIONAL PARTNERS, LLC'S REPONSE TOW ASSERSTEIN'S PETITION TO VACATE THE INTERIM ARBITRATION AWARD

Declaration - DECLARATION OF VIRGINIA HUGHSO -OTTE, DDS IN SUPPORT OF TOURNEY PROFESSIONAL PARTNERS, LLC'S REPONSE TO WASSERSTEIN'S PETITION TO VACATE THE INTERIM ARBITRATION AWARD

2/22/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF VIRGINIA HUGHSO -OTTE, DDS IN SUPPORT OF TOURNEY PROFESSIONAL PARTNERS, LLC'S REPONSE TO WASSERSTEIN'S PETITION TO VACATE THE INTERIM ARBITRATION AWARD

Response to Petition

2/22/2021: Response to Petition

Notice of Related Case

2/22/2021: Notice of Related Case

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/17/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 02/23/2021

2/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 02/23/2021

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/23/2021

2/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/23/2021

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:52 AM in Department M; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order) of 02/23/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/23/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Jack Wasserstein, DDS (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketResponse to Petition; Filed by Tourney Professional Partners, LLC (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF JUSTIN MORGAN, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF TOURNEY PROFESSIONAL PARTNERS, LLC'S REPONSE TOW ASSERSTEIN'S PETITION TO VACATE THE INTERIM ARBITRATION AWARD); Filed by Tourney Professional Partners, LLC (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF VIRGINIA HUGHSO -OTTE, DDS IN SUPPORT OF TOURNEY PROFESSIONAL PARTNERS, LLC'S REPONSE TO WASSERSTEIN'S PETITION TO VACATE THE INTERIM ARBITRATION AWARD); Filed by Tourney Professional Partners, LLC (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Jack Wasserstein, DDS (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketPetition to Vacate or Alter Arbitration Award (CCP 1285 - 1287.6); Filed by Jack Wasserstein, DDS (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Jack Wasserstein, DDS (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF PETITIONER JACK E. WASSERSTEIN IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO VACATE INTERIM ARBITRATION AWARD); Filed by Jack Wasserstein, DDS (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOURNEY PROFESSIONAL PARTNERS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DECLERCQ WILLIAM