Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/15/2021 at 05:03:16 (UTC).

JACK DARAKJIAN VS BRIAN DAVID PEARCY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 JACK DARAKJIAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BRIAN DAVID PEARCY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4279

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DARAKJIAN JACK

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PEARCY BRIAN DAVID DBA PRIME BUILDERS AND LANDSCAPING

WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION

PEARCY BRIAN DAVID

NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW YORK CORPORATION

Cross Defendant

PEARCY BRIAN DBA PRIME BUILDERS AND LANDSCAPING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

CADE NATHANAEL PHILIPPE

HOROWITZ JEFFREY

Other Attorneys

APANIAN MILENE

APANIAN MILENE C.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/26/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/26/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Cross-Complaint

3/22/2021: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

3/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Answer

3/22/2021: Answer

Answer

4/5/2021: Answer

Answer

4/5/2021: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/4/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/3/2021: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • Hearing06/03/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by BRIAN DAVID PEARCY (Defendant); BRIAN DAVID PEARCY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY, a New York corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY, a New York corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY, a New York corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by JACK DARAKJIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JACK DARAKJIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by JACK DARAKJIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by JACK DARAKJIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by JACK DARAKJIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by JACK DARAKJIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by JACK DARAKJIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESCO INSURANCE COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY A NEW YORK CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer APANIAN MILENE