This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/12/2019 at 10:13:21 (UTC).

J R GROUP INC. VS CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE

Case Summary

On 10/09/2019 J R GROUP INC filed a Contract - Business Governance lawsuit against CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JAMES C. CHALFANT and SAMANTHA JESSNER. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4372

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business Governance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JAMES C. CHALFANT

SAMANTHA JESSNER

 

Party Details

Petitioner

J R GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Respondent

CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ZHAO JENNY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/21/2019: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

10/24/2019: Request for Dismissal

Order - ORDER REINSTATING J R GROUP, INC. TO ACTIVE STATUS

10/25/2019: Order - ORDER REINSTATING J R GROUP, INC. TO ACTIVE STATUS

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 10/21/2019

10/21/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT) OF 10/21/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

10/21/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE REASSIGNMENT TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER GRANTING VERIFIED PETITION

10/24/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER GRANTING VERIFIED PETITION

Order - ORDER REINSTATING J R GROUP, INC. TO ACTIVE STATUS

10/25/2019: Order - ORDER REINSTATING J R GROUP, INC. TO ACTIVE STATUS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER GRANTIN...)

10/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER GRANTIN...)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/9/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/9/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition - VERIFIED PETITION FOR ORDER REINSTATING J R GROUP, INC. TO ACTIVE STATUS

10/9/2019: Petition - VERIFIED PETITION FOR ORDER REINSTATING J R GROUP, INC. TO ACTIVE STATUS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

10/15/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/15/2019

10/15/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/15/2019

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 39; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (For Entry of An Order Granting Verified Petition) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Entry of An Order Grantin...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketOrder (Reinstating J R Group, Inc. To Active Status); Filed by J R Group Inc., a California Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by J R Group Inc., a California Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (For Entry of An Order Granting Verified Petition); Filed by J R Group Inc., a California Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 1, Samantha Jessner, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by J R Group Inc., a California Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to Independent Calendar Court)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment to Independent Calendar Court) of 10/21/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER GRANTING THE VERIFIED PETITION FOR ORDER REINSTATING PETITIONER J R GROUP, INC. TO ACTIVE STATUS) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Docketat 09:10 AM in Department 85, James C. Chalfant, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/15/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by J R Group Inc., a California Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketVerified Petition For Order Reinstating J R Group, Inc. To Active Status; Filed by J R Group Inc., a California Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZHAO JENNY