Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/28/2021 at 07:23:56 (UTC).

J. M. VS LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 06/05/2020 J M filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1344

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

M. J.

Defendant

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KAWAI JOHN ALAN

DELACRUZ VITO R

Defendant Attorney

PRECIADO ARTHUR

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION

10/9/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION

Answer

9/18/2020: Answer

Answer

9/21/2020: Answer

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ARTHUR JAVIER UNDER CCP 435.5(A)(2)

9/8/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ARTHUR JAVIER UNDER CCP 435.5(A)(2)

Proof of Service by Mail

9/9/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Personal Service

8/3/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/16/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

6/16/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

PI General Order

6/10/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/10/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Complaint

6/5/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/5/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/5/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/8/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2023
  • Hearing06/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • Hearing12/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • Hearing11/19/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Association); Filed by J. M. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF ARTHUR JAVIER UNDER CCP 435.5(a)(2)); Filed by LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by J. M. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by J. M. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by J. M. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by J. M. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by J. M. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by J. M. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRECIADO ARTHUR