This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2021 at 06:49:18 (UTC).

J. L., ET AL. VS AZUSA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 01/17/2020 J L filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AZUSA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2350

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

J.L. A MINOR BY HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM VERONICA LEROY

Defendant

AZUSA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ELLIS WARREN M.

ELLIS WARREN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/30/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Refund / Order

5/26/2020: Request for Refund / Order

Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account

7/15/2020: Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PRO

4/29/2020: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PRO

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

5/5/2020: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE: COMPROMISE OF PEN...)

5/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE: COMPROMISE OF PEN...)

Order - ORDER DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT

5/5/2020: Order - ORDER DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE: COMPROMISE OF PEN...) OF 05/05/2020

5/5/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE: COMPROMISE OF PEN...) OF 05/05/2020

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/18/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

1/27/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

1/27/2020: PI General Order

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

1/28/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - NOTICE OF REJECTION - EX PARTE APPLICATION WITHOUT HEARING FOR GUARDIAN AD ILTEM RE: J.L.

1/22/2020: Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - NOTICE OF REJECTION - EX PARTE APPLICATION WITHOUT HEARING FOR GUARDIAN AD ILTEM RE: J.L.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/17/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/17/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/17/2020: Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (/ Proof of deposit into blocked account) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by J.L., a minor, by his Guardian Ad Litem, Veronica Leroy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by J.L., a minor, by his Guardian Ad Litem, Veronica Leroy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketRequest for Refund / Order; Filed by J.L., a minor, by his Guardian Ad Litem, Veronica Leroy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • Docketat 2:44 PM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketOrder (Deposit Money into Blocked Account); Filed by J.L., a minor, by his Guardian Ad Litem, Veronica Leroy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order: Expedited Petition to Approve: Compromise of Pen...) of 05/05/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order: Expedited Petition to Approve: Compromise of Pen...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by J.L., a minor, by his Guardian Ad Litem, Veronica Leroy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketExpedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person with a Disability (Miscellaneous); Filed by J.L., a minor, by his Guardian Ad Litem, Veronica Leroy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by J.L., a minor, by his Guardian Ad Litem, Veronica Leroy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by J.L., a minor, by his Guardian Ad Litem, Veronica Leroy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing (for Guardian ad iltem re: J.L.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by J.L., a minor, by his Guardian Ad Litem, Veronica Leroy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by J.L., a minor, by his Guardian Ad Litem, Veronica Leroy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AZUSA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT A GOVERNMENT ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELLIS WARREN