This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/12/2023 at 06:09:45 (UTC).

J. B. WHOLESALE ROOFING AND BUILDING SUPPLIES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS SUPERIOR ROOF SOLUTIONS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/15/2022 J B WHOLESALE ROOFING AND BUILDING SUPPLIES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SUPERIOR ROOF SOLUTIONS INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MELVIN D. SANDVIG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1398

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MELVIN D. SANDVIG

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

J. B. WHOLESALE ROOFING AND BUILDING SUPPLIES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SUPERIOR ROOF SOLUTIONS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

TSE AN INDIVIDUAL TELLY

ZCT LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ROOFLINE INC. AN OREGON CORPORATION DBA J.B. WHOLESALE ROOFING AND BUILDING SUPPLIES

COHEN LESLIE

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

MERCHANTS BONDING COMPANY MUTUAL AN IOWA CORPORATION

SAGER AN INDIVIDUAL DAVID

SUPERIOR ROOF SOLUTIONS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RIGGEN SAMANTHA

Defendant Attorney

SOSA CARLOS EDUARDO

Cross Defendant Attorney

NG CHRISTOPHER ERIC

 

Court Documents

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

8/29/2023: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

8/25/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

8/25/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Default Judgment

8/16/2023: Default Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SEVER)

8/16/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SEVER)

Case Management Statement

8/14/2023: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/14/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

7/7/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/13/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

6/8/2023: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Motion re: - MOTION RE: TO DEPOSIT BY STAKEHOLDER

6/8/2023: Motion re: - MOTION RE: TO DEPOSIT BY STAKEHOLDER

Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

6/6/2023: Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/6/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION OF RENE JIMENEZ IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT JUDGMENT

5/8/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF RENE JIMENEZ IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF COURT JUDGMENT

Summary of the Case

5/8/2023: Summary of the Case

Request for Dismissal

5/8/2023: Request for Dismissal

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER K. TREMBLEY, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SEVER ACTION

5/8/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CHRISTOPHER K. TREMBLEY, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SEVER ACTION

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/8/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2023
  • Hearing10/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F47 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Hearing on Motion - Other To Deposit by Stakeholder

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2023
  • Hearing09/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department F47 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: J. B. Wholesale Roofing and Building Supplies, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment or ORDER; Filed by: J. B. Wholesale Roofing and Building Supplies, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Superior Roof Solutions Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); David Sager, an individual (Defendant); Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual), an Iowa corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • DocketNotice of Entry of JUDGMENT or Order; Filed by: J. B. Wholesale Roofing and Building Supplies, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Superior Roof Solutions Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); David Sager, an individual (Defendant); Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual), an Iowa corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Sever: Filed By: J. B. Wholesale Roofing and Building Supplies, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 08/16/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2023
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Signed and Filed by: J. B. Wholesale Roofing and Building Supplies, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Superior Roof Solutions Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); David Sager, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Status Date changed from 08/16/2023 to 08/16/2023 ; Document changed from Judgment to Default Judgment ; Result Date changed from 08/16/2023 to 08/16/2023 ; As To Parties changed from David Sager, an individual (Defendant), Superior Roof Solutions Inc., a California corporation (Defendant) to David Sager, an individual (Defendant), Superior Roof Solutions Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2023
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff J. B. Wholesale Roofing and Building Supplies, Inc., a California corporation against Defendant Superior Roof Solutions Inc., a California corporation and Defendant David Sager, an individual on the Complaint filed by J. B. Wholesale Roofing and Building Supplies, Inc., a California corporation on 12/15/2022 for the principal amount of $27,100.35, attorney fees of $1,203.01, interest of $3,607.20, and costs of $622.90 for a total of $32,533.46.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (HEARING ON MOTION TO SEVER)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketSummons on Cross-Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual), an Iowa corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: J. B. Wholesale Roofing and Building Supplies, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Superior Roof Solutions Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/28/2022; Service Cost: 93.95; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: J. B. Wholesale Roofing and Building Supplies, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual), an Iowa corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 12/22/2022; Service Cost: 48.45; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F47

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: J. B. Wholesale Roofing and Building Supplies, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Superior Roof Solutions Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); David Sager, an individual (Defendant); Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual), an Iowa corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: J. B. Wholesale Roofing and Building Supplies, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Superior Roof Solutions Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); David Sager, an individual (Defendant); Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual), an Iowa corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: J. B. Wholesale Roofing and Building Supplies, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Superior Roof Solutions Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); David Sager, an individual (Defendant); Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual), an Iowa corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Melvin D. Sandvig in Department F47 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******1398 Hearing Date: August 16, 2023 Dept: F47

Dept. F47

Date: 8/16/23

Case #*******1398

MOTION TO SEVER

Motion filed on 5/8/23.

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff J.B. Wholesale Roofing and Building Supplies, Inc.

RESPONDING PARTY: All other parties

NOTICE: ok

RELIEF REQUESTED: An order severing Defendants Superior Roof Solutions Inc. (SRS) and David Sager (Sager) from this action and entering judgment by default against SRS under the 1st, 2nd, 3rd, 4th and 6th causes of action of Plaintiff’s complaint, and against Sager under the 5th cause of action of Plaintiff’s complaint.

RULING: The unopposed motion is granted.

SUMMARY OF ACTION & PROCEDURAL HISTORY

Plaintiff J.B. Wholesale Roofing and Building Supplies, Inc. (Plaintiff), a wholly owned subsidiary of SRS Distribution Inc., a Delaware corporation, is in the business of selling, among other things, roofing material, equipment, supplies and related goods for use in construction and other applications (Materials). This action arises from the furnishing of Materials to Defendant Superior Roof Solutions Inc., a California corporation (SRS) for use in its business.

On or about 3/18/21, Plaintiff and SRS executed a written credit application and agreement (Credit Agreement) for the supply of Materials. On the same date, Defendant David Sager (Sager), the owner of SRS, agreed in writing to personally guarantee payment of all past, present, and future indebtedness of SRS to Plaintiff (the Guaranty) (SRS and Sager may be collectively referred to as Defendants).

Based on the Credit Agreement and Guaranty, Plaintiff opened a credit account for

SRS, pursuant to which Plaintiff supplied Materials on credit for, among other things, use in SRS’s business. The terms and conditions of the Credit Agreement and Guaranty made in

consideration of Plaintiff opening a credit account for SRS are applicable to the account

opened under the Credit Agreement. Said terms and conditions are also contained in the

written invoices used to confirm the purchases by SRS from Plaintiff. The terms and

conditions of the Credit Agreement, the Guaranty, and the confirming invoices form the

written contract by which Plaintiff supplied Materials to SRS (the Contract).

The Contract provided, in relevant part, that Plaintiff would sell Materials to SRS, and that SRS would pay Plaintiff for said Materials by the 25th day of the month from the date of invoice. Pursuant to the Contract, Plaintiff provided Materials to SRS at the request of SRS. Each shipment of Materials to SRS was confirmed by an invoice sent to SRS.

On 12/15/22, Plaintiff filed this action against Defendants to collect the amounts owed for the Materials provided. Plaintiff’s complaint also seeks enforcement of Plaintiff’s claim against the license bond of SRS. The license bond surety, Defendant/Cross-Complainant Merchants Bonding Company (Mutual), an Iowa corporation (Merchants), has filed an interpleader cross-complaint, which Plaintiff has answered and which remains pending.

After having been served with the summons and complaint, SRS and Sager (Defendants) have failed to file responsive pleadings. As a result, default was entered against Defendants on 2/9/23.

On 5/8/23, Plaintiff filed and served the instant motion which seeks an order severing SRS and Sager from this action and entering judgment by default against SRS on the 1st, 2nd, 3rd, 4th and 6th causes of action in Plaintiff’s complaint, and against Sager on the 5th cause of action in Plaintiff’s complaint in the amount of $32,533.46 which includes interest, attorneys’ fees and costs, as recoverable under the Contract and applicable law. On 5/8/23, Plaintiff also dismissed Does 1-20. No opposition or other response to the motion has been filed.

Upon the granting of this motion, Plaintiff indicates that it will proceed to prosecute the remaining license bond claim against Merchants and Does 21-30, inclusive.

ANALYSIS

Since all defendants named in this action are jointly and severally liable to Plaintiff on the claims alleged in this action, Plaintiff properly joined all defendants in this action. See CCP 379.

CCP 579 provides:

“In an action against several defendants, the Court may, in its discretion, render judgment against one or more of them, leaving the action to proceed against the others, whenever a several judgment is proper.”

CCP 1048(b) provides:

“The court, in furtherance of convenience or to avoid prejudice, or when separate trials will be conducive to expedition and economy, may order a separate trial of any cause of action, including a cause of action asserted in a cross-complaint, or of any separate issue or of any number of causes of action or issues, preserving the right of trial by jury required by the Constitution or a statute of this state or of the United States.”

The Court finds that it is in the interests of justice and judicial economy to sever this action and enter default judgment against Defendants as requested.

CONCLUSION

The motion is granted.