Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/24/2021 at 07:14:38 (UTC).

IZYDOR WILCHFORT VS LOS ANGELES HOUSING & COMMUNITY INVESTMENT DEPARTMENT

Case Summary

On 09/08/2020 IZYDOR WILCHFORT filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against LOS ANGELES HOUSING COMMUNITY INVESTMENT DEPARTMENT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2886

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WILCHFORT IZYDOR

Respondent

LOS ANGELES HOUSING & COMMUNITY INVESTMENT DEPARTMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ABB WAYNE M.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

12/23/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Ruling

12/9/2020: Notice of Ruling

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)]

12/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

12/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/18/2020

9/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/18/2020

Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

9/16/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON PETITION

Notice of Related Case

9/17/2020: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

9/10/2020: Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/8/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/8/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Petition for Writ of Mandate

9/8/2020: Petition for Writ of Mandate

Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATION

9/8/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATION

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Izydor Wilchfort (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 86; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Trial Setting Conference)]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ((Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Izydor Wilchfort (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • Docketat 3:15 PM in Department 86; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/18/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Izydor Wilchfort (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Petition); Filed by Izydor Wilchfort (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Izydor Wilchfort (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (Addendum and Statement of Location); Filed by Izydor Wilchfort (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate; Filed by Izydor Wilchfort (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ABB WAYNE M. ESQ.