Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/13/2019 at 01:56:57 (UTC).

IXA REALTY VS CHERYL KENNEDY

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 IXA REALTY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHERYL KENNEDY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON and MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0241

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

I.X.A. REALTY

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 10

KENNEDY CHERYL

CHERYL C. KENNEDY TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

DENIS STANLEY T. ESQ.

DENIS STANLEY THEODORE JR

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

HARBISON KENYON

ROBERT PECEL ATTY AT LAW

PECEL ROBERT LUKA

 

Court Documents

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

2/13/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

Minute Order

8/15/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

9/24/2018: Minute Order

DEFENDANT'S WITNESS LIST FOR TRIAL

9/17/2018: DEFENDANT'S WITNESS LIST FOR TRIAL

PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST FOR TRIAL

9/17/2018: PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST FOR TRIAL

PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS LIST FOR TRIAL

9/17/2018: PLAINTIFF'S WITNESS LIST FOR TRIAL

DEFENDANT ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

2/2/2018: DEFENDANT ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE

2/2/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown

2/20/2018: Unknown

NOTICE OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT TIIEREFOR; DECLARATION OF STANLEY DENTS; [PROPOSED] FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT LODGED AND SUBMITTED

5/1/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT TIIEREFOR; DECLARATION OF STANLEY DENTS; [PROPOSED] FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT LODGED AND SUBMITTED

DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/10/2018: DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT

5/24/2018: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT

NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/25/2018: NOTICE OF RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

5/30/2018: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF CHERYL KENNEDY IN REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

8/10/2018: EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF CHERYL KENNEDY IN REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

10/25/2017: NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

10/26/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

SUMMONS

10/18/2017: SUMMONS

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 02/04/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Notice of Settlement (of Entire Case); Filed by I.X.A. REALTY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 45; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) (Mandatory Settlement Conference; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 52; Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Off Calendar) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-10-04 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-10-04 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 52; Jury Trial - Not Held - Trailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Defendant's Written Consent

    Read MoreRead Less
86 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2018
  • NOTICE OF INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Notice of Status Conference filed; Filed by I.X.A. REALTY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS & COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by I.X.A. REALTY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Notice of Status Conference filed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by I.X.A. REALTY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2010
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by I.X.A. REALTY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DENIS STANLEY THEODORE