This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 10:02:36 (UTC).

IWONA HISZPANSKI VS WOODWARD HTR INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/11/2018 IWONA HISZPANSKI filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against WOODWARD HTR INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5839

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HISZPANSKI IWONA

Defendants and Respondents

WOODWARD INC.

WOOWARD HRT INC.

GLOBAL HUMAN RESOURCES

TEXTRON INC.

HR TEXTRON INC.

WOODWARD GOVERNOR COMPANY

BOWTHORPE KENNETH

DOES 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

PAYAB DAVID ESQ.

HALE MATTHEW TYLER

Defendant Attorneys

LABERGE KAMILA LINDSAY

DAVIS FELICIA ANNE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/24/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/25/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Separate Statement

7/25/2019: Separate Statement

Reply

8/7/2019: Reply

Objection

8/7/2019: Objection

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

7/18/2018: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

CIVIL DEPOSIT

8/21/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

8/24/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/4/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

9/10/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order

9/10/2018: Minute Order

Answer

10/23/2018: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/5/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Opposition

5/2/2019: Opposition

Status Report

5/29/2019: Status Report

Minute Order

5/31/2019: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/21/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS

5/11/2018: SUMMONS

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • Hearingat 09:30 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • Hearingat 09:30 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • Hearingat 16:00 PM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (DEFENDANTSWOODWARD HRT, INC., WOODWARD, INC. AND KENNETH BOWTHORPE?S SUPPLEMENTAL EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION); Filed by Wooward HRT, Inc. (Defendant); Woodward Inc. (Defendant); Kenneth Bowthorpe (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Wooward HRT, Inc. (Defendant); Woodward Inc. (Defendant); Kenneth Bowthorpe (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketReply (DEFENDANTS? REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND ADJUDICATION); Filed by Wooward HRT, Inc. (Defendant); Woodward Inc. (Defendant); Kenneth Bowthorpe (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketReply (DEFENDANTS WOODWARD HRT, INC., WOODWARD, INC., AND KENNETH BOWTHORPE?S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION); Filed by Wooward HRT, Inc. (Defendant); Woodward Inc. (Defendant); Kenneth Bowthorpe (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketObjection (DEFENDANTS? OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF IWONA HISZPANSKI?S EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT AND ADJUDICATION); Filed by Wooward HRT, Inc. (Defendant); Woodward Inc. (Defendant); Kenneth Bowthorpe (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Iwona Hiszpanski (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Iwona Hiszpanski (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Iwona Hiszpanski (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. DISPARATE TREATMENT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WOODWARD HRT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Woodward on behalf of CWS Compensation., Robert N is a litigant

Latest cases where TEXTRON, INCORPORATED, d/b/a Lycoming Engines is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAYAB DAVID