Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 10:59:55 (UTC).

IVO NKWENJI, ET AL VS. ROUNDTREE 1 VAN NUYS, LLLC

Case Summary

On 10/27/2017 IVO NKWENJI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROUNDTREE 1 VAN NUYS, LLLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SHIRLEY K. WATKINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6415

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SHIRLEY K. WATKINS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NKWENJI JULIE

NKWENJI IVO

Defendants

ROUNDTREE 1 VAN NUYS LLLC

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

INFINITI OF VAN NUYS

ROUNDTREE 1 VAN NUYS LLC DBA INFINITI OF VAN NUYS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NSAHLAI EMMANUEL

NSAHLAI EMMANUEL KONGNYUY

Defendant Attorneys

ROBINETT TIMOTHY DOUGLAS

BERBERICH DANIEL FRANCIS

PRUDIAN GARY HAROUTOIN

 

Court Documents

Order Granting Attorney"s Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

6/4/2019: Order Granting Attorney"s Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Proof of Service by Mail

6/6/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Trial Brief

6/20/2019: Trial Brief

Minute Order

6/24/2019: Minute Order

Summons

10/27/2017: Summons

Summons

1/12/2018: Summons

Summons

3/9/2018: Summons

Legacy Document

3/26/2018: Legacy Document

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

9/28/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Motion in Limine

1/31/2019: Motion in Limine

Declaration

2/13/2019: Declaration

Minute Order

2/14/2019: Minute Order

Opposition

2/14/2019: Opposition

Declaration

2/14/2019: Declaration

Motion re:

2/14/2019: Motion re:

Declaration

2/14/2019: Declaration

Declaration

2/14/2019: Declaration

Notice of Ruling

2/26/2019: Notice of Ruling

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • Trial Brief; Filed by Ivo Nkwenji (Plaintiff); Julie Nkwenji (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • Witness List; Filed by Ivo Nkwenji (Plaintiff); Julie Nkwenji (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by Roundtree 1 Van Nuys, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil (for defendant Roundtree 1 Van Nuys)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department T, Shirley K. Watkins, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2018
  • Notice (To Attorneys Re: Continuance of Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Ivo Nkwenji (Plaintiff); Julie Nkwenji (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Ivo Nkwenji (Plaintiff); Julie Nkwenji (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Ivo Nkwenji (Plaintiff); Julie Nkwenji (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by Roundtree 1 Van Nuys, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ivo Nkwenji (Plaintiff); Julie Nkwenji (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Ivo Nkwenji (Plaintiff); Julie Nkwenji (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: LC106415    Hearing Date: August 27, 2020    Dept: T

NKWENJI; et. al.,

Plaintiff,

vs.

ROUNDTREE; et. al.

Defendants.

CASE NO: LC106415

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE WITH CONDITIONS

Dept. T

8:30 a.m.

Aug. 27, 2020

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE CONTINGENT UPON SWORN DECLARATION OF FAULT UNDER C.C.P. SECTION 473(b) FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR (x3), FAILURE TO FILE JUDGMENT PACKAGE AND FAILURE TO FILE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS. PAYMENT OF PENALTY OF $750 PAYABLE BY MR. NSHLAI TO THE STATE BAR CLIENT SECURITY FUND PER C.C.P. SECTION 473(c)(1)(B)

The court tentatively grants the motion to vacate order of dismissal. The court addresses individually each of the bases for the motion. However, it is contingent upon a sworn declaration pursuant to C.C.P. section 473(b).

1. FAILURE TO APPEAR AT HEARING ON 9/5/19

Mr. Nshlai fails to acknowledge that he did not attend the hearing on 9/5/19. He states in his declaration, “on information and belief, I was present in court on 9/5/19 when the default judgment was entered, although the Court seems to indicate that I was not present in court.” He accepts no fault for his lack of appearance. Indeed, the minutes of the court reflect that not only was he not present but an OSC re sanctions was scheduled against him for 10/7/19 for failure to appear, the OSC re entry of default was continued to 10/7/19 and notice was given to him by the clerk of the court. Notice was sent to Mr. Nshlai to his office on 3250 Wilshire. No change of address had been submitted and this was his address of record. The notice was not returned to the court as undeliverable.

2. FAILURE TO APPEAR AT HEARING ON 10/7/19

Mr. Nshlai acknowledges he was aware of the 10/7/19 hearing. Unfortunately, his declarations under oath give two different versions of why did not attend.

The court notes that in his declaration of 5/7/20, Mr. Nshlai stated that he did not attend the 10/7/19 hearing due to “inadvertence and excusable neglect” because due to “health reasons and unable to talk to the clerk on the morning of 10/7/19 to advise of being sick and unable to appear."

However, Mr. Nshlai stated in his declaration of 8/25/20 that he talked to the clerk on 10/7/19 and told her that “due to a personal emergency” he was unable to attend the hearing. Clearly these two declarations are at odds with each other. In one he was “unable to talk to the clerk” and in the other he “told the clerk” that he could not appear.

In the declaration in which he admits talking to the clerk, he said that she indicated he would received notice of a new court date in the mail. It should be noted that it is the policy in Dept. T that if a lawyer misses a hearing and calls in later that day, the clerk will advise the lawyer of the new hearing date in the call. Regardless, the court assessed sanctions against Mr. Nshlai at the hearing on 10/7/19 and notice was sent to him of the court’s order that same date with a new hearing date for 12/13/19. The notice was sent to his address at 3250 Wilshire. No change of address had been submitted and this was his address of record. The notice was not returned to the court as undeliverable. Notice was also sent to counsel for the defendant.

Regardless, Mr. Nshlai gives no credible explanation for his failure to appear on 10/7/19, instead giving conflicting testimony for his reasons.

3. FAILURE TO APPEAR ON 12/13/19

Mr. Nshlai states that he did not receive actual or constructive notice of the hearing date of 12/13/19, yet the clerk of the court served him with notice and it was not returned to the court as undeliverable. Mr. Nshlai states that because he did not receive notice of the 12/13/19, he did not submit a judgment package. This makes no sense. Submitting the judgment package was his obligation ever since default was entered. Whether or not he had notice of a hearing on 12/13/19 did not affect his obligation to submit a judgment package. He offers no explanation from which the court can discern that he accepts responsibility for his failure to submit the judgment package. Also, he does not state whether he ever looked at the court file online to discern when the next hearing date would be as it would have been noted in the minutes from the 10/7/19 hearing.

Mr. Nshlai was served with the notice on 12/13/19 of the court’s dismissal of the case. It was served to his address of record. Again, Mr. Nshlai states that he did not receive it. This is the third notice to him that he claims he never received (notices of 9/5/19, 10/7/19 and 12/13/19) and he offers no explanation at all for that. Instead he waited for 4 1/2 months before looking at the file online at which time he “realized” that the case had been dismissed without prejudice.

4. MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL

Mr. Nshlai states in his declaration of 8/25/20 that on 2/23/20, he reviewed the file and “discovered” the case had been dismissed. In his declaration of 5/7/2, he stated that he did a “diary” review of the file and discovered the dismissal.

Mr. Nshlai indicates that while it was his intention to file a motion to vacate the dismissal, the intervening COVID crisis prevented him from doing so. The court notes that the motion to vacate the dismissal was filed on 5/7/20 while the court was still operating under emergency conditions. There was nothing preventing the filing of the motion between 2/23/20 and 5/7/20 and he offers no real explanation and certainly nothing which would constitute attorney mistake.

5. FAILURE TO FILE NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

Ms. Nshlai filed a change of address for his office on 5/14/20. However, he states in his declaration that he moved his offices on 8/15/19, thereby acknowledging a 9 month delay in notifying the court of his change of address. Although he states that he made arrangements for mail to be forwarded to his new address, it does not go unnoticed that the three notices he claims not to have received (notices of 9/5/19, 10/7/19 and 12/13/19) were all sent to him after he moved offices. He offers no explanation or accept responsibility for his failure to file the required notice of change of address.

6. CONCLUSION

Mr. Nshlai has gone to extremes to not take any personal responsibility for his inaction and failures to appear. The court would be inclined, in the interests of justice and so as to not prejudice his client, to allowing Mr. Nshlai to comply with the requirements of C.C.P. section 473(b) in order to obtain mandatory relief: a sworn affidavit attesting to his mistake, inadvertence, surprise or neglect. C.C.P. section 473. What he wants is relief without admitting fault. That remedy is not available to him because he has not acknowledged that anything is his responsibility.

The decision whether to submit a supplemental declaration will be Mr. Nshlai’s as the court is granting him leave to do so.

IT IS SO ORDERED, CLERK TO GIVE NOTICE.