This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/11/2021 at 17:27:21 (UTC).

IVETTE ARCA VS GABRIEL LEIGH GALLAGHER

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 IVETTE ARCA filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GABRIEL LEIGH GALLAGHER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4933

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARCA IVETTE

Defendant

GALLAGHER GABRIEL LEIGH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GAGE BRADLEY CURTIS

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/7/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2024
  • Hearing07/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • Hearing01/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • Hearing12/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ivette Arca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ivette Arca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ivette Arca (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GAGE BRADLEY C