This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2022 at 06:28:48 (UTC).

IVAR PATAO ZUNIGA, ET AL. VS AUTOZONE WEST, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/09/2022 IVAR PATAO ZUNIGA filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AUTOZONE WEST, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8470

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANCHEZ BRIGITTE

Defendants

AUTOZONE WEST INC.

BWDAC INC. AKA F/K/A BWD AUTOMOTIVE CORPORATION;

CBS CORPORATION AKA F/K/A VIACOM INC. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER WITH CBS CORPORATION AKA F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION;

CRANE CO.

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY INC.

DANA COMPANIES LLC

ENERPAC TOOL GROUP CORP.

FORD MOTOR COMPANY

FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

GENUINE PARTS COMPANY

HENNESSY INDUSTRIES LLC

IMO INDUSTRIES INC.

INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION AKA F/K/A THE CARBORUNDUM COMPANY;

JOHN CRANE INC.

MORSE TEC LLC AKA F/K/A BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC AND SUCCESSOR-BY- MERGER TO BORG-WARNER CORPORATION;

O'REILLY AUTO ENTERPRISES LLC AKA F/K/A CSK AUTO INC.;

PARKER HANNIFIN CORPORATION

PNEUMO ABEX LLC

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLDSTEIN ESQ BENJAMIN D

Defendant Attorneys

BAILEY BOBBIE RAE

SCADDEN JAMES

HUGO EDWARD

CALFO PAUL ANGELO

DAVIS GEOFFREY M.

GILEFSKY SUSAN

MEAK VANTHARA

MOORADIAN ALINA

POND FRANK D.

ZWARG NICHOLAS T.

EBRAHAMIAN SALIN

SCHEFFY MIRNA J.

TAVERA LEONARD

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF TRIAL SETTING ORDER

7/25/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF TRIAL SETTING ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER FOR PREFERENTIAL TRIAL-SETTING PURS...)

7/7/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER FOR PREFERENTIAL TRIAL-SETTING PURS...)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE CSR: CARLA S. WALKER/ #6001

7/8/2022: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE CSR: CARLA S. WALKER/ #6001

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS'' MOTION FOR PREFERENCE IN TRIAL-SETTING

7/8/2022: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS'' MOTION FOR PREFERENCE IN TRIAL-SETTING

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PREFERENTIAL TRIAL-SETTING PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 36(D)

7/8/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PREFERENTIAL TRIAL-SETTING PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 36(D)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE CSR: MABEL HAYEK/ #11815

7/20/2022: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE CSR: MABEL HAYEK/ #11815

Order - [PROPOSED] TRIAL SETTING ORDER FOR ASBESTOS LITIGATION PREFERENCE CASE

7/20/2022: Order - [PROPOSED] TRIAL SETTING ORDER FOR ASBESTOS LITIGATION PREFERENCE CASE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE (ZUNIGA-22STCV08470))

7/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE (ZUNIGA-22STCV08470))

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT BWDAC, INC.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PREFERENTIAL TRIAL-SETTING PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 36(D)

6/21/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT BWDAC, INC.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PREFERENTIAL TRIAL-SETTING PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 36(D)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT TEXACO INC.S [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, STAY OF DR. DENIS MCCARTHYS DEPOSITION UNTIL DETERMINATION OF TEXACO INC.S MOTION FOR PROT

6/23/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT TEXACO INC.S [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, STAY OF DR. DENIS MCCARTHYS DEPOSITION UNTIL DETERMINATION OF TEXACO INC.S MOTION FOR PROT

Joinder - DEFENDANT HENNESSY INDUSTRIES, LLCS JOINDER TO DEFENDANT BWDAC, INC.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PREFERENCE PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 36(D)

6/23/2022: Joinder - DEFENDANT HENNESSY INDUSTRIES, LLCS JOINDER TO DEFENDANT BWDAC, INC.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PREFERENCE PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 36(D)

Joinder - DEFENDANT PNEUMO ABEX LLCS JOINDER TO DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PREFERENTIAL TRIAL-SETTING PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 36(D)

6/23/2022: Joinder - DEFENDANT PNEUMO ABEX LLCS JOINDER TO DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PREFERENTIAL TRIAL-SETTING PURSUANT TO CCP SECTION 36(D)

Joinder - DEFENDANTS MORSE TEC LLC AND THE PEP BOYS MANNY, MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIAS JOINDER TO DEFENDANT BWDAC, INC.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PREFERENTIAL TRIAL-SETTING PURSUANT TO C

6/23/2022: Joinder - DEFENDANTS MORSE TEC LLC AND THE PEP BOYS MANNY, MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIAS JOINDER TO DEFENDANT BWDAC, INC.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PREFERENTIAL TRIAL-SETTING PURSUANT TO C

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT WESTERN AUTO SUPPLY COMPANYS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SET A PREFERENTIAL TRIAL DATE; DECLARATION OF JAMES BUCK IN SUPPORT THEREOF

6/23/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT WESTERN AUTO SUPPLY COMPANYS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SET A PREFERENTIAL TRIAL DATE; DECLARATION OF JAMES BUCK IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ALINA MOORADIAN ISO DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR TRIAL SETTING PREFERENCE

6/23/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ALINA MOORADIAN ISO DEFENDANT FORD MOTOR COMPANYS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR TRIAL SETTING PREFERENCE

Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PREFERENTIAL TRIALSETTING PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 36(D)

6/29/2022: Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFFS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PREFERENTIAL TRIALSETTING PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 36(D)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE A. RENKEN IN SUPPORT OF REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 36(D), FOR ORDER GRANTING PREFERENCE IN SE

6/29/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE A. RENKEN IN SUPPORT OF REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 36(D), FOR ORDER GRANTING PREFERENCE IN SE

81 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2022
  • Hearing10/31/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • Hearing10/17/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 15; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) ((Zuniga-22STCV08470)) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Trial Setting Order); Filed by Ivar Patao Zuniga (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 15; Further Status Conference ((ZUNIGA-22STCV08470)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference (ZUNIGA-22STCV08470))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (CSR: Mabel Hayek/ #11815); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • Docket[Proposed] Trial Setting Order for Asbestos Litigation Preference Case; Filed by Ivar Patao Zuniga (Plaintiff); Brigitte Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketNotice (Notice Of Entry Of Order Granting Plaintiffs? Motion For Preferential Trial-Setting Pursuant To Code Of Civil Procedure Section 36(D)); Filed by Ivar Patao Zuniga (Plaintiff); Brigitte Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketOrder (Order Granting Plaintiffs'' Motion for Preference in Trial-Setting); Filed by Ivar Patao Zuniga (Plaintiff); Brigitte Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketAnswer (To Complaint By Standard Motor Products, Inc. And Parker Hannifin Corporation); Filed by Parker Hannifin Corporation (Defendant); Standard Motor Products, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Remote Appearance); Filed by Parker Hannifin Corporation (Defendant); Standard Motor Products, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketAnswer (To Complaint); Filed by Enerpac Tool Group Corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Order Assigning Case); Filed by Ivar Patao Zuniga (Plaintiff); Brigitte Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ivar Patao Zuniga (Plaintiff); Brigitte Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ivar Patao Zuniga (Plaintiff); Brigitte Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ivar Patao Zuniga (Plaintiff); Brigitte Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketPreliminary Fact Sheet; Filed by Ivar Patao Zuniga (Plaintiff); Brigitte Sanchez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENERPAC TOOL GROUP CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where AUTOZONE WEST, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MORSE TEC LLC FKA BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO BORGWARNER CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where HENNESSY INDUSTRIES INC. is a litigant