This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/04/2021 at 15:31:28 (UTC).

IVANIA MERCEDES MONCADA VS MACERICH CERRITOS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/03/2021 IVANIA MERCEDES MONCADA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MACERICH CERRITOS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8519

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MONCADA IVANIA MERCEDES

Defendants

MACERICH CERRITOS LLC

MACERICH MANAGEMENT COMPANY

PROFESSIONAL LANDSCAPE MAINTENANCE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOOTHE DENNIS H.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/3/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2024
  • Hearing07/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • Hearing01/31/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • Hearing01/17/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by IVANIA MERCEDES MONCADA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by IVANIA MERCEDES MONCADA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MACERICH MANAGEMENT COMPANY ERRONEOUSLY SUED AND SERVED AS THE MACERICH COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where MACERICH CERRITOS LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOOTHE DENNIS H.