Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/28/2021 at 13:13:48 (UTC).

IVAN TODORIUK, ET AL. VS GILLES FIGUIER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/08/2020 IVAN TODORIUK filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GILLES FIGUIER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5530

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TODORIUK IVAN

TODORIUK NATALIIA

TODORIUK NATALIA

Defendants

CAPRETTI MARIO

FIGUIER GILLES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LANDVER ALINA

LANDVER ALINA ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/6/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

11/17/2020: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

9/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/28/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (FICTITIOUS/INCORRECT NAME) (INCORRECT NAME: MARIO CAPRETTI - CORRECT NAME: MARCO CAPRETTI)

8/28/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (FICTITIOUS/INCORRECT NAME) (INCORRECT NAME: MARIO CAPRETTI - CORRECT NAME: MARCO CAPRETTI)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

7/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

7/17/2020: PI General Order

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

7/8/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/8/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/8/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/8/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

7/8/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Complaint

7/8/2020: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2023
  • Hearing07/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • Hearing01/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • Hearing12/22/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ivan Todoriuk (Plaintiff); Natalia Todoriuk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Ivan Todoriuk (Plaintiff); Natalia Todoriuk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ivan Todoriuk (Plaintiff); Natalia Todoriuk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ivan Todoriuk (Plaintiff); Natalia Todoriuk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) ((incorrect Name: Mario Capretti - CORRECT Name: Marco Capretti)); Filed by Ivan Todoriuk (Plaintiff); Natalia Todoriuk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ivan Todoriuk (Plaintiff); Natalia Todoriuk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ivan Todoriuk (Plaintiff); Natalia Todoriuk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ivan Todoriuk (Plaintiff); Natalia Todoriuk (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LANDVER ALINA