This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/03/2021 at 03:55:23 (UTC).

IVAN OMAR MORALES, AN INDIVIDUAL VS WINSFARGO TRANSPORT INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/06/2020 IVAN OMAR MORALES, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against WINSFARGO TRANSPORT INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9737

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORALES AN INDIVIDUAL IVAN OMAR

Defendants

MILESTONE CHASSIS COMPANY LLC

ORELLANA SALOMON MOISES AN INDIVIDUAL

WINSFARGO TRANSPORT INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EISON OWILI K.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

12/2/2020: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

8/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

8/14/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/6/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/6/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/6/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

8/6/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Ivan Omar Morales, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ivan Omar Morales, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ivan Omar Morales, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ivan Omar Morales, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WINSFARGO TRANSPORT INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eison, Owili K