This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2019 at 02:00:10 (UTC).

IVAN LUIS VS SECOND STREET CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/22/2018 IVAN LUIS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SECOND STREET CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1018

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LUIS IVAN

Respondents, Defendants and Not Classified By Court

SECOND STREET CORPORATION

HUNTLEY HOUSE HOTEL

DOES 1 TO 50

SECOND STREET CORPORATION DBA HUNTLEY HOUSE HOTEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

JACKSON ARMOND M.

JACKSON ARMOND MARCED

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

GORDON & REES LLP

LURTZ MARSHALL RYAN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/3/2019: Request for Dismissal

Order

3/14/2019: Order

Minute Order

3/14/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/14/2019: Minute Order

Request for Judicial Notice

1/22/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Proof of Personal Service

1/22/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Memorandum

1/22/2019: Memorandum

Notice of Motion

1/22/2019: Notice of Motion

Declaration

1/22/2019: Declaration

Minute Order

6/5/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

5/22/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

5/22/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

5/22/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

5/21/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

5/21/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

5/21/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

4/4/2018: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE

4/4/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Ivan Luis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (Motion for Approval of PAGA Settlement) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion for Approval of PAGA Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Order (PAGA settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • at 08:35 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (Motion for Approval of PAGA Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion - Other Motion for Approval of PAGA Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Second Street Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR 1. VIOLATION OF THE CALIFORNIA FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING ACT (GOV'T CODE, 1294O (A) DISABIUTY PISCRIM1NATION) ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Ivan Luis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SECOND STREET CORPORATION (DOE 1) is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JACKSON ARMOND