This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/19/2019 at 10:26:10 (UTC).

IVAN LAUREANO VS DOLLAR TREE STORES INC

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by IVAN LAUREANO against DOLLAR TREE STORES INC in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8851

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Guardian Ad Litems, Not Yet Classified and Plaintiffs

FELIX MARY

LAUREANO IVAN

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 25

DOLLAR TREE STORES INC

Minor and Not Yet Classified

LAUREANO IVAN

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for

7/18/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Minute Order

7/18/2019: Minute Order

Order - Dismissal

7/18/2019: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order

5/1/2019: Minute Order

Certificate of Mailing for

5/1/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Notice of Settlement

5/1/2019: Notice of Settlement

Notice of Settlement

5/1/2019: Notice of Settlement

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD L1TEM?CIVIL

1/30/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD L1TEM?CIVIL

SUMMONS

2/16/2018: SUMMONS

ORDER FOR REMAND

9/7/2018: ORDER FOR REMAND

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

6/25/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

7/11/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

7/11/2018: DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY AND SUPERIOR COURT OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

7/20/2018: NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY AND SUPERIOR COURT OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

1/16/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL EX PARTE

1/30/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL EX PARTE

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) ((Conditional)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Order - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (Conditional))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (Conditional)) of 07/18/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • at 3:46 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Ivan Laureano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2018
  • Summons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD L1TEM CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • STATEMENT OF DAMAGES [C.C.P. 425.11]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • STATEMENT OF DAMAGES (C.C.P. 425.11J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Statement of Decision; Filed by Ivan Laureano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC688851    Hearing Date: November 08, 2019    Dept: 5

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

ivan laureano,

Plaintiff,

v.

dollar tree stores inc.,

Defendant.

Case No.: BC688851

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

petition to approve compromise of pending action

The Petition to approve the compromise of this pending action by Petitioner Mary Felix (“Petitioner”) on behalf of Claimant Ivan Laureano (“Claimant”) is continued to afford Petitioner an opportunity to correct the following issues:

1. In Section 5(a) of the petition, Petitioner states that Claimant’s claim is not the subject of a pending action. That is incorrect.

2. In Section 9 of the petition, Petitioner represents that Claimant underwent significant medical treatment because of the accident at issue. However, Petitioner has not included any medical expenses in Section 14 of the petition. Then, in Section 18(b) of the petition, Petitioner seeks approval to deduct $2,430.63 in medical expenses from the settlement. These discrepancies must be corrected.

3. In Section 15(b) of the petition, Petitioner asks the Court to approve a litigation cost for the delivery of chambers copies to the United States District Court. This appears to be in error, as this case is not pending in federal court.

4. In Section 17 of the petition, Petitioner states that Claimant is to receive $5,500 in proceeds from the settlement, but in Section 18(f) of the petition, Petitioner states that Claimant is to receive $2,430.63 in proceeds.

5. In Section 19(b) of the petition, Petitioner indicates that Claimant’s counsel expects to receive attorneys’ fees from another party to this litigation, but has not otherwise completed that section.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

The Court previously continued this matter to afford Petitioner an opportunity to correct these deficiencies, but no corrections have been made. Therefore, the Court denies the motion without prejudice. Petitioner shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: November 8, 2019 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court