This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/15/2021 at 19:29:39 (UTC).

IVAN GASPAR VS THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/20/2020 IVAN GASPAR filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5153

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GASPAR IVAN

Defendant

THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RASTEGAR FARZAD

Defendant Attorneys

BRADLEY BARRY A.

PARK DANIEL J

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON POST MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE

4/15/2021: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON POST MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

4/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Related Case

3/22/2021: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

11/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Answer - DEFENDANT, THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF, IVAN GASPAR'S COMPLAINT

9/4/2020: Answer - DEFENDANT, THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF, IVAN GASPAR'S COMPLAINT

Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

8/17/2020: Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Status Conference Statement

7/29/2020: Status Conference Statement

Notice of Appearance

7/2/2020: Notice of Appearance

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/28/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Initial Status Conference Order

5/29/2020: Initial Status Conference Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/30/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/29/2020, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

5/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/29/2020, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/20/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/20/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • Hearing10/15/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 6 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (on Post mediation Status Conference); Filed by The World Protection Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by The World Protection Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketDefendant, The World Protection Group, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff, Ivan Gaspar's Complaint; Filed by The World Protection Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketOrder Authorizing Electronic Service; Filed by Ivan Gaspar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2020
  • Docketat 10:31 AM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/29/2020, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ivan Gaspar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ivan Gaspar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ivan Gaspar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ivan Gaspar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ivan Gaspar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE WORLD PROTECTION GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RASTEGAR FARZAD