This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/24/2020 at 00:10:48 (UTC).

IVAN ARGUETA VS CALCRETE CONSTRUCTION INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/05/2018 IVAN ARGUETA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CALCRETE CONSTRUCTION INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6452

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARGUETA IVAN

Defendants

CALCRETE INC

PRVT HOLDINGS CORP

CALCRETE CONSTRUCTION INC

SOUTH EAST EMPLOYEE LEASING SERVICES INC

SOUTH EAST PERSONNEL LEASING INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YOUNESSI RAMIN RAY ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

CHAIN BETTY STASZEK ESQ.

RICHARDS WILLIAM BRADFORD JR.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF GOV'T CODE 1294O ET SEQ.; ETC

3/5/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF GOV'T CODE 1294O ET SEQ.; ETC

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/30/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

11/14/2019: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANTS SOUTH EAST PERSONNEL LEASING, INC. AND CALCRETE CONSTRUCTIONS, INC.'S JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED PRETRIAL DATES AND

7/22/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANTS SOUTH EAST PERSONNEL LEASING, INC. AND CALCRETE CONSTRUCTIONS, INC.'S JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED PRETRIAL DATES AND

Proof of Service by Mail

7/22/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF BETTY S. CHAIN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SOUTH EAST PERSONNEL LEASING, INC. AND CALCRETE CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND A

7/22/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF BETTY S. CHAIN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SOUTH EAST PERSONNEL LEASING, INC. AND CALCRETE CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND A

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ERIC R. DEITZ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SOUTH EAST PERSONNEL LEASING, INC. AND CALCRETE CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND AL

7/22/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ERIC R. DEITZ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SOUTH EAST PERSONNEL LEASING, INC. AND CALCRETE CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND AL

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION

7/23/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATE...)

7/23/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATE...)

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE 1 FOR ORDER PRECLUDING DEFENDANTS FROM ELICITING OR INTRODUCING INADMISSIBLE EVIDENCE CONCERNING PLAINTIFF'S IMMIGRATION STATUS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIE

8/5/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE 1 FOR ORDER PRECLUDING DEFENDANTS FROM ELICITING OR INTRODUCING INADMISSIBLE EVIDENCE CONCERNING PLAINTIFF'S IMMIGRATION STATUS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/5/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE 2 FOR AN ORDER PRECLUDING DEFENDANT FROM ELICITING OR INTRODUCING INADMISSIBLE EVIDENCE CONCERNING ANY PLAINTIFF'S WORKER'S COMPENSATION ACTIONS

8/5/2019: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE 2 FOR AN ORDER PRECLUDING DEFENDANT FROM ELICITING OR INTRODUCING INADMISSIBLE EVIDENCE CONCERNING ANY PLAINTIFF'S WORKER'S COMPENSATION ACTIONS

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED PRETRIAL DATES AND DEADLINES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

8/15/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED PRETRIAL DATES AND DEADLINES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF BETTY S. CHAIN IN SUPPORT OF JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION

8/15/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF BETTY S. CHAIN IN SUPPORT OF JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION

Proof of Service by Mail

8/15/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ERIEC DEITZ IN SUPPORT OF JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

8/15/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ERIEC DEITZ IN SUPPORT OF JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED PRETRIAL DATES AND DEADLINES

8/15/2019: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED PRETRIAL DATES AND DEADLINES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL REL...)

8/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL REL...)

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2020
  • Hearing08/17/2020 at 09:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • Hearing08/07/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Ivan Argueta (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Ivan Argueta (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketOrder ([PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONITUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED PRETRIAL DATES AND DEADLINES); Filed by South East Personnel Leasing, Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED PRETRIAL DATES AND DEADLINES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL REL...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-03-13 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Ivan Argueta (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICAL OFFICER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ivan Argueta (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF GOV'T CODE 1294O ET SEQ.; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRVT HOLDINGS CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where Calcrete Construction, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTH EAST EMPLOYEE LEASING SERVICES INC. is a litigant