Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/22/2021 at 05:10:41 (UTC).

IV SOLUTIONS, INC VS. CIGNA HEALTHCARE OF CALIFORNIA ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 05/02/2018 IV SOLUTIONS, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CIGNA HEALTHCARE OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GERALD ROSENBERG, BOBBI TILLMON and KENNETH R. FREEMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9221

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GERALD ROSENBERG

BOBBI TILLMON

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IV SOLUTIONS INC.

Defendants

CONNECTICUT GENERAL LIF INSURANCE CO.

CIGNA HEALTHCARE OF CALIFORNIA INC.

CIGNA HEALTH MANAGEMENT INC.

CIGNA HEALTH AND LIFE INSURANCE CO.

CONNECTICUT GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE CO.

CONNECTICUT GENERAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PROUT ANDREW G.

THEODORA ORINGHER

ORINGHER THEODORA

WENTLAND ADAM G

DIOTALEVI JESSICA STARR

DUGAN BRADLEY JAMES

ROHATINER MARC ELIOT

LEVINRAD ERIC

Defendant Attorneys

COOLEY LLP

JOHNSON NOEL C.

DONOVAN WILLIAM P. JR

CAPLAN MATTHEW D.

DONOVAN WILLIAM PATRICK JR

HAMMOND KATE MARIE

 

Court Documents

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER REGARDING WITHDRAWN CLAIMS

10/15/2020: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER REGARDING WITHDRAWN CLAIMS

Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE BASED ON PARTIES STIPULATION; STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

7/17/2020: Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE BASED ON PARTIES STIPULATION; STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER [PROPOSED] PERMITTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE TWO SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS BASED ON PARTIES STIPULATION; STIPULATION PERMITTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE TWO SUMMARY

7/17/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER [PROPOSED] PERMITTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE TWO SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS BASED ON PARTIES STIPULATION; STIPULATION PERMITTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE TWO SUMMARY

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANTS' STATEMENT REGARDING INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

7/2/2020: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANTS' STATEMENT REGARDING INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

8/8/2019: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/10/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Case Management Statement

3/20/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

1/17/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/2/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

5/11/2018: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

5/17/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Proof-Service/Summons

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/5/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Declaration

6/26/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Declaration

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/29/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) second amended complaint

10/29/2018: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) second amended complaint

Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/28/2018: Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Request for Judicial Notice -

9/13/2018: Request for Judicial Notice -

Memorandum of Points & Authorities -

8/28/2018: Memorandum of Points & Authorities -

94 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • Hearing10/04/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • Hearing09/24/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • Hearing06/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • Docketat 2:10 PM in Department O; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Stipulation to Continue Trial ...) of 03/19/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Stipulation to Continue Trial ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department O; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department O; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketStipulation - No Order (Regarding Withdrawn Claims); Filed by IV SOLUTIONS, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF ERRATA); Filed by IV SOLUTIONS, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
165 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-05-14 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketNotice-Related Cases ( REL/W - BC672920); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by IV SOLUTIONS, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by IV SOLUTIONS, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketCCP 170.6 Application Filed ( AGAINST JUDGE ROSENBERG); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by IV SOLUTIONS, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by IV SOLUTIONS, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketComplaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cigna Health Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CIGNA Healthcare of California Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where IV SOLUTIONS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Connecticut General Life Insurance Company is a litigant