This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/18/2019 at 00:01:12 (UTC).

ITAMAR AVRAHAM VS OFIR HAIMOFF ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/24/2017 ITAMAR AVRAHAM filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against OFIR HAIMOFF. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0932

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

AVRAHAM ITAMAR

Defendants and Respondents

BEN-NISSAN MORI

HAIMOFF OFIR

MEMEGED TEUOT SHEMESH INC

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ROSE ADAM M. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

MOUZIS GERALD W.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for

6/17/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Notice of Settlement

6/17/2019: Notice of Settlement

Request for Dismissal

8/12/2019: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order

4/25/2019: Minute Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/10/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/2/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Minute Order

2/6/2018: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

2/16/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS, OFIR HAIMOF, MORI BEN-NISSAN, AND MEMEGED TEVUOT SHEMESH DBA TITAN SOLAR CONSTRUCTION TO COMPLAINT OF ITAMAR AVRAHAM

2/28/2018: ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS, OFIR HAIMOF, MORI BEN-NISSAN, AND MEMEGED TEVUOT SHEMESH DBA TITAN SOLAR CONSTRUCTION TO COMPLAINT OF ITAMAR AVRAHAM

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

3/5/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CIVIL DEPOSIT

3/6/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

3/6/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Minute Order

3/6/2018: Minute Order

CIVIL DEPOSIT

3/16/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

3/16/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/14/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUMMONS

10/30/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT

10/24/2017: COMPLAINT

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Retain Jurisdiction); Filed by ITAMAR AVRAHAM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by ITAMAR AVRAHAM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Final Status Conference) of 06/17/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by ITAMAR AVRAHAM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by ITAMAR AVRAHAM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ITAMAR AVRAHAM (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC680932    Hearing Date: November 13, 2019    Dept: 61

Plaintiff Itamar Avraham’s Motion to Enforce Settlement Against Defendant Ofir Haimoff is  DENIED. (Mesa RHF Partners, L.P. v. City of Los Angeles (2019) 33 Cal.App.5th 913.) Either the settlement agreement signed by the parties or the stipulation to retain jurisdiction signed by the parties must be filed with or before the filing of the dismissal, as the court loses jurisdiction upon the filing of the dismissal.