This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/20/2021 at 08:11:03 (UTC).

ISSA TEWFIQ AGHABI VS NATASHA SABRINA SIMONE

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 ISSA TEWFIQ AGHABI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NATASHA SABRINA SIMONE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6203

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGHABI ISSA TEWFIQ

Defendant

SIMONE NATASHA SABRINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARABEDIAN MEGHRY V.

Defendant Attorney

PATTON CHRISTOPHER L.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/17/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

3/5/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

3/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/22/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

6/14/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/14/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2024
  • Hearing02/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • Hearing08/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • Hearing08/03/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Natasha Sabrina Simone (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Natasha Sabrina Simone (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Issa Tewfiq Aghabi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Issa Tewfiq Aghabi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Issa Tewfiq Aghabi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Issa Tewfiq Aghabi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PATTON CHRISTOPHER LYNN