This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/09/2020 at 02:04:54 (UTC).

ISRAEL REYES ET AL VS GABRIEL CEJA

Case Summary

On 03/12/2018 ISRAEL REYES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GABRIEL CEJA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7730

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Guardian Ad Litems

RODRIGUEZ MARIA RAMOS

REYES ISRAEL

REYES JESUS

REYES OSCAR

Defendants and Respondents

CEJA GABRIEL

DOES 1 TO 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BALBUENA ROBERT A.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...) OF 12/07/2020

12/7/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...) OF 12/07/2020

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

10/5/2020: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

10/5/2020: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)

10/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)

7/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)]

3/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)

3/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO ENTER DEFAUL...)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/7/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

2/27/2019: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/27/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

2/27/2019: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Proof of Personal Service

4/4/2019: Proof of Personal Service

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

6/19/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

6/19/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

3/23/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

3/23/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

3/23/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

Unknown

3/12/2018: Unknown

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2021
  • Hearing03/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to Enter Default Judgment) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Enter Defaul...) of 12/07/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Enter Defaul...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for Failure to Enter Default Judgment) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Enter Defaul...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (Plaintiff Israel Reyes' Declaration in Support of Request for Court's Default Judgment Against Defendant Gabriel Ceja); Filed by Israel Reyes (Plaintiff); Jesus Reyes (Plaintiff); Oscar Reyes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Jesus Reyes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Oscar Reyes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Israel Reyes (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Israel Reyes (Plaintiff); Jesus Reyes (Plaintiff); Oscar Reyes (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Relocation Rescheduling; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC697730    Hearing Date: December 07, 2020    Dept: 27

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

ISRAEL REYES et al.,

Plaintiffs,

vs.

GABRIEL CEJA, et al.,

Defendants.

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO.: BC697730

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Dept. 27

8:30 a.m.

OSC: December 7, 2020

)

On March 12, 2018, plaintiffs Israel Reyes (“Israel”), Maria Ramos Rodriguez, and Jesus Reyes (“Jesus”) and Oscar Reyes (“Oscar”), by and through their Guardian Ad Litem, Israel Reyes (“Plaintiffs”) filed this motor vehicle negligence action against defendants Gabriel Ceja (“Ceja”) and does defendants. Plaintiffs suffered bodily injury and property damage.

Ceja was personally served with the summons and complaint on March 24, 2019. Default was entered against Ceja on January 9, 2020. Does one through 20 have not been dismissed.

On October 5, 2020, Plaintiffs filed three statement of damages. Jesus seeks $18,000 in general damages and $6,005 in special damages. Oscar seeks $12,000 in general damages and $2,310 in special damages. Israel seeks $20,000 in general damages and $11,615 in special damages. This represents a total of $69,930. These amounts are also reflected in counsel’s supporting declaration.

However, per Judicial Council Form JUD-100, Plaintiffs seek a judgment of only $54,990.65 consisting of $54,067.06 in damages and $923.59 in costs.

The court notes the following deficiencies: (1) Plaintiffs have not filed the mandatory Judicial Council Form CIV-100 for entry of court judgment; (2) Plaintiffs have not dismissed Does 1 through 20; (3) Form JUD-100 does not reflect the amount requested in the Statement of Damages or in counsel’s declaration; (4) Plaintiff has not provided evidence of future medical expenses; and (5) Plaintiffs’ request for general damages appears high and unsupported by the submitted evidence.

The court denies Plaintiffs’ application without prejudice, so that Plaintiff may cure the defects detailed above.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court’s website at www.lacourt.org.

Dated this 7th day of December 2020

Hon. Judge Edward B. Moreton

Judge of the Superior Court