This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2019 at 05:15:04 (UTC).

ISRAEL MEZA HERNANDEZ VS ROGER SOHN ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/16/2018 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by ISRAEL MEZA HERNANDEZ against ROGER SOHN in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8099

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

HERNANDEZ ISRAEL MEZA

Respondents and Defendants

SOHN ROGER

MEZA FAUSTO

DOES 1 TO 30

SOHN FRANCINE

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT FRANCINE SOHNS NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT;AND ETC.

6/1/2018: DEFENDANT FRANCINE SOHNS NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT;AND ETC.

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

6/1/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Other -

7/12/2018: Other -

Legacy Document

7/12/2018: Legacy Document

Other -

7/12/2018: Other -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

7/31/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

DEFENDANT FRANCINE SOHN'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF MATTHEW A. GARDNER

8/9/2018: DEFENDANT FRANCINE SOHN'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF MATTHEW A. GARDNER

PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FRANCINE SOHN'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC

8/21/2018: PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT FRANCINE SOHN'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC

DEFENDANT FRANCINE SOHN?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST-AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/28/2018: DEFENDANT FRANCINE SOHN?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST-AMENDED COMPLAINT

ORDER SUSTAINING THE DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

9/5/2018: ORDER SUSTAINING THE DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order

9/5/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF RULING SUSTAINING DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/6/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF RULING SUSTAINING DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Summons

10/5/2018: Summons

Answer

10/17/2018: Answer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/16/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

12/5/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

SUMMONS

3/16/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

3/16/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Israel Meza Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Israel Meza Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Answer (to Second Amended Complaint); Filed by Francine Sohn (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Second Amended Summons; Filed by Israel Meza Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF RULING SUSTAINING DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Francine Sohn (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 3; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike (DEMURRER; Sustained) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-09-05 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Order; Filed by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Israel Meza Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Demurrer; Filed by Francine Sohn (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Israel Meza Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Israel Meza Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Israel Meza Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC698099    Hearing Date: February 21, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

ISRAEL MEZA HERNANDEZ,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

ROGER SOHN, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: BC698099

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Dept. 31

1:30 p.m.

February 21, 2020

Plaintiff’s attorney of record, Anthony R. Lopez Jr. of Southwest Legal Group (“Counsel”), seeks to be relieved as counsel, contending that he and Plaintiff Israel Meza Hernandez (“Plaintiff”) have irreconcilable conflicts as to the future prosecution of the case.  Additionally, Counsel states that Plaintiff lives in El Salvador, and therefore is unable or unwilling to participate and assist with the prosecution of his case.  Counsel states that he and Plaintiff have spoken and cannot settle their dispute, nor does Counsel believe their conflicts can be resolved.

In compliance with CRC Rule 3.1362, Counsel properly filed forms MC-051 - Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel, MC-052 – Declaration in Support of Attorney’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel, and MC-053 – Proposed Order Granting Attorney’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel.  Counsel has also filed proof of service of all forms on his client and on all other parties who have appeared in the action.  Counsel was able to confirm that Plaintiff’s address is current within the past 30 days by telephone.

The motion is unopposed and granted; the ruling is effective upon filing proof of service of the final order.  To the extent Plaintiff will be prejudiced by a granting of this motion as trial is currently set for March 24, 2020, the Court is inclined to continue the trial.

Counsel is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.