Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/13/2021 at 03:35:01 (UTC).

ISRAEL CONNECTION CORP. VS I-PACK EXPRESS CORP.

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 ISRAEL CONNECTION CORP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against I-PACK EXPRESS CORP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0015

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ISRAEL CONNECTION CORP.

ISRAEL CONNECTION CORP

Defendants

I-PACK EXPRESS CORP.

I-PACK EXPRESS CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COHEN BARUCH C.

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/21/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF STEVEN BERGER

6/21/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF STEVEN BERGER

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/4/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail

4/9/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/12/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Mail

4/22/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/15/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2021
  • Hearing08/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 15 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Israel Connection, Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF STEVEN BERGER); Filed by Israel Connection, Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Israel Connection, Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail (- Notice of CMC); Filed by Israel Connection, Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Israel Connection, Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Israel Connection, Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Israel Connection, Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Israel Connection, Corp (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COHEN BARUCH C.