Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/28/2019 at 13:18:57 (UTC).

ISRAEL BRONSTEIN & RACHEL WEISER, TRUSTEES OF THE SAM AND MOLLY BROBSTEIN FAMILY TRUST DATED JUNE 4, 1999 VS IDA FINKELSTEIN BRONSTEIN,

Case Summary

On 03/18/2019 ISRAEL BRONSTEIN RACHEL WEISER, TRUSTEES OF THE SAM AND MOLLY BROBSTEIN FAMILY TRUST DATED JUNE 4, 1999 filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against IDA FINKELSTEIN BRONSTEIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9270

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ISRAEL BRONSTEIN & RACHEL WEISER TRUSTEES OF THE SAM AND MOLLY BROBSTEIN FAMILY TRUST

ISRAEL BRONSTEIN & RACHEL WEISER AKA THE BRONSTEIN FAMILY TRUST

Defendant

IDA FINKELSTEIN BRONSTEIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COHEN BARUCH C.

Defendant Attorney

STEINER LEONARD SAMUEL

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/12/2019: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Mail

6/11/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/3/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

6/20/2019: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Declaration

4/22/2019: Declaration

Proof of Service by Mail

4/8/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/2/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

3/27/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice

3/20/2019: Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/18/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice

3/18/2019: Notice

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/18/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons

3/18/2019: Summons

Complaint

3/18/2019: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by ISRAEL BRONSTEIN & RACHEL WEISER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 73; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • DocketDemurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by IDA FINKELSTEIN BRONSTEIN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by ISRAEL BRONSTEIN & RACHEL WEISER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 430.41(a)(2)); Filed by IDA FINKELSTEIN BRONSTEIN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by ISRAEL BRONSTEIN & RACHEL WEISER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ISRAEL BRONSTEIN & RACHEL WEISER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Errata to Verified Complaint); Filed by ISRAEL BRONSTEIN & RACHEL WEISER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ISRAEL BRONSTEIN & RACHEL WEISER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION); Filed by ISRAEL BRONSTEIN & RACHEL WEISER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ISRAEL BRONSTEIN & RACHEL WEISER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ISRAEL BRONSTEIN & RACHEL WEISER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEINER LEONARD SAMUEL