Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2021 at 07:42:28 (UTC).

ISRAEL BASHAREL VS SCHLOMO SCHMUEL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/25/2021 ISRAEL BASHAREL filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SCHLOMO SCHMUEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0073

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Burbank Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BASHAREL ISRAEL

Defendants

RED DRAGON INVESTMENT A NEVADA CORPORATION

SCHMUEL SCHLOMO

CASPAR MANAGEMENT CO. LLC

CASPAR MANAGEMENT CO. LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ASISS SHLOMI

ISS DEVELOPMENT LLC

BASHAREL AVRAHAM

BASHAREL LEAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RING BART IVAN

 

Court Documents

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

6/2/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

6/2/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

6/2/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

6/2/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Request for Dismissal

5/7/2021: Request for Dismissal

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

5/7/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/4/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/4/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Related Case

3/5/2021: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Lis Pendens

2/3/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/25/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/25/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/25/2021: Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • Hearing08/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • Hearing08/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Hearing on Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • Hearing06/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Israel Basharel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Israel Basharel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Israel Basharel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Israel Basharel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Israel Basharel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Israel Basharel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Israel Basharel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Israel Basharel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Israel Basharel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Israel Basharel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Israel Basharel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Israel Basharel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Israel Basharel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CASPAR MANAGEMENT CO. LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RING BART IVAN